Norwich v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Norwich
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Beverly Sackler, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Allergan PLC, Collegium Pharmaceutical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Theresa Sackler, David Sackler, Actavis LLC, Rhodes Technologies, Rite Aid Corporation, Walmart Inc, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Richard Sackler, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., John Kapoor, Cardinal Health Inc, Actavis Inc, SpecGX LLC, Purdue Pharma Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Kathe Sackler
Case Number: 3:2019cv00770
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Peterson, M)
June 28, 2019 Filing 72 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Clerk John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel; MDL Panel. (Peterson, M)
June 26, 2019 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #56 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph G. Cleemann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5316591) by City of Norwich. (Cleemann, Joseph)
June 26, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Cleemann on behalf of City of Norwich (Cleemann, Joseph)
June 26, 2019 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #55 MOTION for Attorney(s) Judith S. Scolnick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5316560) by City of Norwich. (Scolnick, Judith)
June 26, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith S. Scolnick on behalf of City of Norwich (Scolnick, Judith)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/20/2019. Signed by Clerk on 06/21/2019. (Peterson, M)
June 20, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stacey Anne Mahoney to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5327895) by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Affidavit Supporting Pro Hac Vice Motion, #2 Exhibit B. Certificate of Good Standing)(Wasil, Christopher)
June 19, 2019 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #52 MOTION for Attorney(s) Douglas J. Pepe, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314985) by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler. (Pepe, Douglas)
June 19, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J. Pepe on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler (Pepe, Douglas)
June 19, 2019 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #50 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mara Leventhal, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314873) by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler. (Leventhal, Mara)
June 19, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Mara Leventhal on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler (Leventhal, Mara)
June 19, 2019 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #51 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gregory P. Joseph, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314938) by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler. (Joseph, Gregory)
June 19, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory P. Joseph on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler (Joseph, Gregory)
June 18, 2019 Filing 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Dwyer, Paul)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER. The #46 motion to stay is GRANTED. This case is hereby STAYED until the JPML issues a final decision on whether to transfer this action to the MDL. If the JPML decides not to transfer the action, any party may file a motion to lift the stay within 7 days of such decision, attaching a copy of the decision to the motion. The Court will then set a briefing schedule on any motion to remand. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/13/2019. (Barclay, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Clerk on 06/13/2019. (Peterson, M)
June 12, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph G. Cleemann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5316591) by City of Norwich. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joseph G. Cleemann)(Ferron, Margaret)
June 12, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Attorney(s) Judith S. Scolnick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5316560) by City of Norwich. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Judith S. Scolnick)(Ferron, Margaret)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 06/12/2019. (Peterson, M)
June 11, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE by Walmart Inc COURT ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS IN SIMILAR CASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit District Court Minute Entry)(Chase, Terri)
June 11, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Attorney(s) Douglas J. Pepe, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314985) by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Declaration of Douglas J. Pepe, Esq.)(Frost, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gregory P. Joseph, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314938) by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Gregory P. Joseph, Esq.)(Frost, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mara Leventhal, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314873) by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mara Leventhal, Esq.)(Frost, Robert)
June 10, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Edwin Dwyer on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Dwyer, Paul)
June 7, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Frost, Jr on behalf of Richard Sackler (Frost, Robert)
June 7, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Frost, Jr on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler (Frost, Robert)
June 5, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Opiate MDL by Walmart Inc.Responses due by 6/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Chase, Terri)
June 4, 2019 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC. (Spears, Brian)
June 4, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Janna Douville Eastwood on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC (Eastwood, Janna)
June 4, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Spears on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC (Spears, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Martin, David)
May 29, 2019 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Wasil, Christopher)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. The #25 , #28 , #31 , #35 , and #38 consented motions for extension of time are GRANTED as follows. All defendants' deadline to respond to the complaint and to conduct the Rule 26(f) planning conference is extended until 60 days after this Court rules on any motion to remand or the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation's decision on a conditional transfer, whichever is later.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/29/2019. (Barclay, Michael)
May 29, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Matthew Abramoske on behalf of Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Rhodes Technologies, Rhodes Technologies Inc. (Abramoske, Bryan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 38 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 days after court's decision on Plaintiff's motion to remand or MDL decision on conditional transfer to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and to Conduct the 26(F) Planning Conference #1 Notice of Removal, by John Kapoor. (Richard, Steven)
May 28, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by James K. Robertson, Jr on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Robertson, James)
May 28, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health Inc identifying Corporate Parent CARDINAL HEALTH INC. for Cardinal Health Inc. (Cox, Maureen)
May 28, 2019 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND TO CONDUCT FED.R.CIV.P. 26(f) CONFERENCE #1 Notice of Removal, by Cardinal Health Inc. (Cox, Maureen)
May 28, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. - Removal Statement (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B)(Daily, Thomas)
May 28, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen Danehy Cox on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Cox, Maureen)
May 28, 2019 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation. (Noonan, Patrick)
May 28, 2019 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for the individual Sackler Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. (Kiernan, John)
May 28, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Wasil on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Wasil, Christopher)
May 28, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Richard on behalf of John Kapoor (Richard, Steven)
May 24, 2019 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chase, Terri)
May 24, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc. (Chase, Terri)
May 24, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Terri L. Chase on behalf of Walmart Inc (Chase, Terri)
May 24, 2019 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and to Conduct the 26(f) Planning Conference #1 Notice of Removal, by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Rinehart, Kim)
May 24, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Rinehart, Kim)
May 24, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim E. Rinehart on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. (Rinehart, Kim)
May 24, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Sheldon, Tara)
May 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Sheldon, Tara)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc. for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Mohan, Catherine)
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Mohan, Catherine)
May 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Mohan, Catherine)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actavis Inc. (D'Ambrosio, John)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret B. Ferron on behalf of City of Norwich (Ferron, Margaret)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Drury, Christopher)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Drury on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Drury, Christopher)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Martin on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Martin, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Agnieszka Romanowska Larson on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Larson, Agnieszka)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. D'Ambrosio on behalf of Actavis Inc (D'Ambrosio, John)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Noonan on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Noonan, Patrick)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Daily, Thomas)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Protective Order, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., #2 Notice (Other) filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 05/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/21/2019. (Peterson, M)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/21/2019. (Peterson, M)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2019. Discovery due by 11/20/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/25/2019. Signed by Clerk on 05/21/2019. (Peterson, M)
May 21, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Daily, Thomas)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. - Notice to Counsel re: Local Rule 5(b) (Daily, Thomas)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. - Notice of No Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Daily, Thomas)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. from Superior Court, Judicial District of New London, case number KNL-CV-19-6040618-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5287841, filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit 3 Walgreens Appearance, #4 Exhibit 4 All Court Filings, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daily, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norwich v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Kim E. Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Represented By: Janna Douville Eastwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Represented By: Robert M. Frost, Jr.
Represented By: Mara Leventhal
Represented By: Gregory P. Joseph
Represented By: Douglas J. Pepe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Matthew Abramoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Christopher R. Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collegium Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Represented By: John S. Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Represented By: Robert M. Frost, Jr.
Represented By: Mara Leventhal
Represented By: Gregory P. Joseph
Represented By: Douglas J. Pepe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies
Represented By: Bryan Matthew Abramoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Terri L. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kim E. Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sackler
Represented By: Robert M. Frost, Jr.
Represented By: Mara Leventhal
Represented By: Gregory P. Joseph
Represented By: Douglas J. Pepe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Matthew Abramoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Represented By: John S. Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Sackler
Represented By: Robert M. Frost, Jr.
Represented By: Mara Leventhal
Represented By: Gregory P. Joseph
Represented By: Douglas J. Pepe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas V. Daily
Represented By: Agnieszka Romanowska Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Represented By: Tara Anne Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Christopher R. Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Represented By: Tara Anne Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Represented By: John S. Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: David T. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher R. Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Paul Edwin Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Represented By: Bryan Matthew Abramoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Represented By: Steven M. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: James K. Robertson, Jr.
Represented By: Maureen Danehy Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Represented By: John P. D'Ambrosio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Represented By: Janna Douville Eastwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Kim E. Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Edwin Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Represented By: John S. Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Norwich
Represented By: Margaret B. Ferron
Represented By: Judith S. Scolnick
Represented By: Joseph Cleemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?