Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Orzechowski et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: John Orzechowski, Maria Orzechowski, Holy Name Athletic Club of Stamford Connecticut Incorporated and Walter Makuck
Case Number: 3:2019cv00772
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Freberg, B)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #11 is So Ordered. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/17/19.(Tooker, A.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Due to Settlement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Lonstein, Wayne)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Holy Name Athletic Club of Stamford Connecticut Incorporated, Walter Makuck, John Orzechowski, Maria Orzechowski* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Wayne D. Lonstein* *Lonstein Law Office, P.C.* *190 South Main St., P.O. Box 351* *Ellenville, NY 12428*. (Reis, Julia)
May 30, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Holy Name Athletic Club of Stamford Connecticut Incorporated, Walter Makuck, John Orzechowski, Maria Orzechowski. (Lonstein, Wayne)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Holy Name Athletic Club of Stamford Connecticut Incorporated, Walter Makuck, John Orzechowski, Maria Orzechowski* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Wayne D. Lonstein* *Lonstein Law Office, Lonstein Professional Bldg.* *80 North Main Street, PO Box 351* *Ellenville, NY 12428*. (Reis, Julia)
May 29, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Holy Name Athletic Club of Stamford Connecticut Incorporated. (Lonstein, Wayne)
May 29, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Walter Makuck. (Lonstein, Wayne)
May 29, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Maria Orzechowski. (Lonstein, Wayne)
May 29, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to John Orzechowski. (Lonstein, Wayne)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (Reis, Julia)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., #3 Notice filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 5/22/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/21/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/21/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2019 Discovery due by 11/20/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 12/25/2019 Signed by Clerk on 5/21/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 21, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. re #1 Complaint, REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING COPYRIGHT (Lonstein, Wayne)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Lonstein, Wayne)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5288081.), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement SUMMONS AS TO JOHN OREZCHOWSKI, #3 Supplement SUMMONS AS TO MARIA ORZECHOWSKI, #4 Supplement SUMMONS AS TO THE HOLY NAME ATHLETIC CLUB OF STAMFORD CONNECTICUT INCORPORATED, #5 Supplement SUMMONS AS TO WALTER MAKUCK)(Lonstein, Wayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Orzechowski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Orzechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Orzechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holy Name Athletic Club of Stamford Connecticut Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Makuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Wayne D. Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?