Ranger v. Waveny Life Care Network
Plaintiff: Michelle Ranger
Defendant: Waveny Life Care Network
Case Number: 3:2019cv00776
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Waveny Life Care Network. (Warren, Abby)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Waveny Life Care Network.(Warren, Abby)
July 9, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Waveny Life Care Network to 7/15/2019. (Freberg, B)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 First MOTION for Extension of Time until July 15, 2019 to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/9/2019. (Freberg, B)
July 8, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/22/2019 (Gutierrez, Y.)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time until July 15, 2019 to Respond to Complaint by Waveny Life Care Network. (Warren, Abby)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Abby M. Warren on behalf of Waveny Life Care Network (Warren, Abby)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Volkman Kushel on behalf of Waveny Life Care Network (Kushel, Rachel)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Waveny Life Care Network* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Eugene N. Axelrod* *Axelrod & Associates, LLC* *8 Lunar Dr.* *Woodbridge, CT 06525*. (Barry, Donna)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Appearance filed by Michelle Ranger, #2 Complaint filed by Michelle Ranger, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols, #5 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 05/23/19. (Barry, Donna)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 05/22/19. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Barry, Donna)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 05/23/19. (Barry, Donna)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 05/23/19. (Barry, Donna)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2019, Discovery due by 11/21/2019 and Dispositive Motions due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Clerk on 05/22/19. (Barry, Donna)
May 21, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
May 21, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Waveny Life Care Network. (Axelrod, Eugene)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Waveny Life Care Network ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5288803.), filed by Michelle Ranger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Axelrod, Eugene)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene N. Axelrod on behalf of Michelle Ranger (Axelrod, Eugene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ranger v. Waveny Life Care Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Ranger
Represented By: Eugene N. Axelrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waveny Life Care Network
Represented By: Abby M. Warren
Represented By: Rachel Volkman Kushel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?