Dautefendic v. Town of Old Saybrook

Plaintiff: Selma Dautefendic
Defendant: Town of Old Saybrook
Case Number: 3:2019cv00786
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER re: Case Management Plan Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2019. Discovery due by 3/2/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/6/2020. Status Report due by 10/11/2019. Trial Brief due by 4/6/2020. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/11/2019.(Reis, Julia)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sarah Wilber terminated. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/10/2019. (Lewis, D)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sastre, Joseph)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Sarah L. Wilber to Withdraw as Attorney by Town of Old Saybrook. (Wilber, Sarah)
June 4, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/8/2019 (Lewis, D)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE LITIGANTS: PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH ATTACHED INITIAL DISCOVERY PROTOCOLS WHICH ARE IN EFFECT FOR THIS CASE. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/3/2019.(Lewis, D)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Affirmative Defenses by Town of Old Saybrook.(Wilber, Sarah)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Town of Old Saybrook, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Town of Old Saybrook, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Town of Old Saybrook, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Town of Old Saybrook, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Town of Old Saybrook, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Town of Old Saybrook, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #9 Standing Protective Order, #10 Standing Order re: Discovery, #11 Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocol Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Attachment)(Reis, Julia)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/22/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/22/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/22/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2019 Discovery due by 11/21/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 12/26/2019 Signed by Clerk on 5/22/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 22, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Bauer, J.)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Rose on behalf of Town of Old Saybrook (Rose, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Wilber on behalf of Town of Old Saybrook (Wilber, Sarah)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Town of Old Saybrook re #1 Notice of Removal, Compliance with Standing Order in Removed Cases (Wilber, Sarah)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Town of Old Saybrook re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of No Pending Motions (Wilber, Sarah)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Town of Old Saybrook re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal (Wilber, Sarah)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Town of Old Saybrook from Superior Court of Middlesex at Middletown, case number MMX-CV19-6024860-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5289578, filed by Town of Old Saybrook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilber, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dautefendic v. Town of Old Saybrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selma Dautefendic
Represented By: Joseph Robert Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Old Saybrook
Represented By: Michael J. Rose
Represented By: Sarah Wilber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?