Hall v. Davis
Plaintiff: Kevin L Hall
Defendant: Herbert Raymond Davis
Case Number: 3:2019cv00788
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for settlement conference SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/12/2019.(Lewis, D)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER re: Case Management Plan Discovery due by 1/15/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2020. Status Report due by 10/11/2019. Trial Brief due by 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/11/2019.(Reis, Julia)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 First REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Steele, Beth)
June 20, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/2/2019 (DeRubeis, B.)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Herbert Raymond Davis.(Malec, Janis)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Janis K. Malec on behalf of Herbert Raymond Davis (Malec, Janis)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin L Hall. Herbert Raymond Davis served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Steele, Beth)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Herbert Raymond Davis* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Beth A. Steele* *DiFrancesca & Steele* *811 Boswell Ave., PO Box 548* *Norwich, CT 06360*. (Reis, Julia)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Kevin L Hall, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/22/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/22/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/22/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2019 Discovery due by 11/21/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 12/26/2019 Signed by Clerk on 5/22/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 22, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Bauer, J.)
May 22, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Herbert Raymond Davis. (Steele, Beth)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Herbert Raymond Davis ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5289739.), filed by Kevin L Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steele, Beth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin L Hall
Represented By: Beth A. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Raymond Davis
Represented By: Janis K. Malec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?