Rios v. Advance Stores Co Inc
Plaintiff: Felix Rios
Defendant: Advance Stores Co Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00790
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2612
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 4/1/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2020. (Imbriani, Susan)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER approving #19 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery is due April 1, 2020. Dispositive motions are due May 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/2/19.(Ladd-Smith, I.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Theriault, Justin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Advance Stores Co Inc.(Theriault, Justin)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 Docket Entry Correction re #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, ADDED PDF (Fazekas, J.)
May 23, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Advance Stores Co Inc to 6/28/2019. (Imbriani, Susan)
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Paradisi on behalf of Felix Rios (Paradisi, Matthew)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time until June 28, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/23/2019. (Welles, T.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #11 Standing Protective Order, #5 Statement Regarding Removal filed by Advance Stores Co Inc, #4 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Advance Stores Co Inc, #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Advance Stores Co Inc, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Advance Stores Co Inc, #10 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Holly L. Cini on behalf of Advance Stores Co Inc, #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Justin E. Theriault on behalf of Advance Stores Co Inc, #6 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 28, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Advance Stores Co Inc, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Certificate of Filing Removal filed by Advance Stores Co Inc Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 Docket Entry Correction re #10 Electronic Filing Order, REPLACEMENT PDF. (Fazekas, J.)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/22/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/22/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2019: #1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Fazekas, J.).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2019. Discovery due by 11/22/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/27/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 5/23/2019 to correct file date (Fazekas, J.). (Fazekas, J.).
May 22, 2019 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Bauer, J.)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin E. Theriault on behalf of Advance Stores Company, Incorporated (Theriault, Justin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Advance Auto Parts, Inc. for Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Cini, Holly)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 28, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Cini, Holly)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal, Statement Regarding Removal (Cini, Holly)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Pending Motions (Cini, Holly)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cini, Holly)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly L. Cini on behalf of Advance Stores Company, Incorporated (Cini, Holly)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated from Hartford Superior Court, case number HHD-CV19-6111478-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5289840, filed by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cini, Holly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rios v. Advance Stores Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Rios
Represented By: Matthew D. Paradisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Stores Co Inc
Represented By: Holly L. Cini
Represented By: Justin E. Theriault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?