Lee v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: David Lee
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00799
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Discovery status teleconference set for 12/18/2019 at 4:30 PM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. To participate in the teleconference, the parties are ordered to call Chambers at 860-240-3123 with all parties on the line. In the alternative, the parties may call Chambers to distribute a dial-in number to the Court. (Shafer, J.)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for Settlement Conference. The parties are directed to contact Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson's Chambers to schedule the settlement conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/12/2019. (Nault, James)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court has evaluated the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report #24 and sets the following case management deadlines. A discovery status teleconference will take place on 12/18/2019 at 4:30 p.m. All discovery, including but not limited to depositions of expert witnesses, shall be completed by 3/27/2020. Dispositive motions are due by 4/20/2020. If no dispositive motions are filed, the joint trial memorandum ("JTM") is due by 6/1/2020, and jury selection will take place on 7/21/2020 in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. If dispositive motions are filed, the JTM is due by 2/20/2021 and jury selection will take place on 4/20/2021 in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month after jury selection is scheduled to take place. The parties are directed to closely follow Chambers' Practices #10 -- including the deadlines and format of filings -- when completing and filing the JTM, which shall be accompanied by the voir dire questions, jury instructions, and motions in limine. All evidentiary objections raised in the JTM must be the subject of a motion in limine and supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. The parties' exhibit binders and electronic exhibits, as well as any courtroom technology requests, must be submitted no later than 2 weeks before jury selection. The Court also requests that any courtesy copies sent to Chambers be printed from the docket and contain the header of the Court's electronic filing system. Based on the parties' Rule 26(f) Report, the court will refer the case to the Honorable Robert A. Richardson for an early settlement conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/12/2019. (Nault, James)
July 11, 2019 Filing 24 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Landau, Jeffrey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 23 26(f) NOTICE: The Court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor the parties compliance with Local Rule 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) provides that, within thirty days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) further provides that, within fourteen days after the conference, the participants must jointly file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). It appears that more than forty-four days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case but no report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties must file on or before 7/24/2019: (1) a written statement signed by all counsel of record demonstrating that this case is exempt from the requirement of filing a form 26(f) report; or (2) a form 26(f) report along with a written statement signed by all counsel of record explaining why sanctions should not be imposed for the parties failure to comply with Local Rule 26(f). Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Clerk on 7/10/2019. (Shafer, J.)
July 5, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Adamucci on behalf of David Lee (Adamucci, Nicholas)
June 13, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Landau, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company re 16 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, 17 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice [NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATES OF GOOD STANDING] (Attachments: #1 Supplement John Meagher's Florida Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Supplement Jeffrey Landau's Florida Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(Meagher, John)
June 4, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by John Edward Meagher on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Meagher, John)
June 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Landau on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Landau, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Attorney Jeffrey M. Landau to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/30/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/31/2019. (Velez, F.)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Attorney John E. Meagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/30/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/31/2019. (Velez, F.)
May 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeffrey M. Landau to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5298544) by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey M. Landau, Esq.)(McManus, Leo)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) John E. Meagher to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5298523) by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John E. Meagher, Esq.)(McManus, Leo)
May 30, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company to 6/13/2019 per Dkt. 13 Order. (Shafer, J.)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time until 6/13/2019. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/30/2019. (Mattessich, William)
May 25, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 06/13/2019 to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (McManus, Leo)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #10 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, #6 Notice (Other) filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, #9 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 5/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Velez, F.)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/23/2019. (Velez, F.)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/23/2019. (Velez, F.)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/23/2019. (Velez, F.)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/23/2019; Discovery due by 11/23/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 12/28/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2019. (Velez, F.) Modified on 5/24/2019 to correct file date (Velez, F.).
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Civil Docket Sheet (McManus, Leo)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 First NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court (McManus, Leo)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 First NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Statement per Standing Order Removed Cases (McManus, Leo)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 First NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Pending State Court Motions (McManus, Leo)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (McManus, Leo)
May 23, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company from Connecticut Superior Court JD Stamford/Norwalk at Stamford, case number FST-CV19-6041370-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5291920, filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(McManus, Leo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee
Represented By: Nicholas Adamucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Leo J. McManus
Represented By: Jeffrey Landau
Represented By: John Edward Meagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?