In re: Brown
Interested Party: Roberta Napolitano
Not Yet Classified: US Trustee
Appellant: Devon T Brown
Appellee: Timothy Pletter
Case Number: 3:2019cv00816
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE TO PRO SE APPELLANT: Appellant Devon T. Brown was required to file his "designation of items to be included in the record on appeal and a statement of the issues to be presented," Fed. R. Bank. Pro. 8009(a)(1)(A), by June 11, 2019. The court is sua sponte granting the pro se appellant an extension to July 12, 2019 to comply with Rule 8009. Failure by the appellant to file his designation of items and statement of issues with the bankruptcy court by that date will result in dismissal of his appeal. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/26/2019. (Patel, R.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 No Designation/Agreed Statement: Filed 19-816(AWT)(RE:) 73 Notice of Appeal to District Court Filed by Devon Brown, Debtor. 71 Order for Compensation to be paid to Ambrogio, Pletter & Associates. Appellant Designation or Agreed Statement due by 6/11/2019. Transmission of Designation due by 6/27/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/5/19. (Ferguson, L.)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Motion by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing (ECF No. #5 ) is hereby GRANTED. The plaintiff is permitted to participate in electronic filing upon completion of the required training class and registering for a PACER account. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/5/2019. (Patel, R.)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Crook on behalf of Roberta Napolitano (Crook, Patrick)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT TO PARTICIPATE IN ELECTRONIC FILING Order by Devon T Brown. (Payton, R.)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/29/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/28/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 17-51350, filed by Devon T Brown. (Attachments: #1 Order #71)(Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Roberta Napolitano
Represented By: Patrick Crook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Devon T Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Timothy Pletter
Represented By: Timothy M. Pletter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?