Espinal v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC.
Plaintiff: Jose G. Espinal
Defendant: Ocwen Servicing LLC. and Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00817
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC..Responses due by 7/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Delinks, Marissa)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose G. Espinal. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Payton, R.)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ocwen Servicing LLC.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Jose G. Espinal* *12 Hillside Street* *Danbury, CT 06810*. (Payton, R.)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Jose G. Espinal Signed by Clerk on 5/30/2019.(Payton, R.)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 5/28/2019.(Payton, R.)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/27/2019 Discovery due by 11/27/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 1/1/2020 Signed by Clerk.(Payton, R.)
May 28, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Ocwen Servicing LLC.. (Payton, R.)
May 28, 2019 Filing fee received from Jose G. Espinal: $ 400.00, receipt number 467907 (Payton, R.)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ocwen Servicing LLC., filed by Jose G. Espinal. (Attachments: #1 Declaratory Relief, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Payton, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinal v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Servicing LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC.
Represented By: Marissa I. Delinks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose G. Espinal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?