Maitland v. Devlin et al
Plaintiff: Maurice Maitland
Defendant: Robert Devlin and John Wolf
Case Number: 3:2019cv00828
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled in this case for October 2, 2019 at 10am. Please see the attached Settlement Conference Order for detailed instructions for the conference. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 7/24/2019.(Watson, M.)
July 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Settlement Conference is set for 10/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 303, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Robert M. Spector (Watson, M.)
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference held on 7/24/2019. 5 minutes (Watson, M.)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/18/2019. (Welles, T.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 20, 2019 Objections and Responses to Discovery Requests by Maurice Maitland. (Clendenen, William)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference is scheduled for 7/24/19 at 4:00 PM with Judge Spector. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 90 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. Please use the following dial-in for this call: (877) 873-8017; Access Code: 7040261. (Watson, M.)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER approving re #13 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 4/15/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2020; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector for settlement conference. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/11/19.(Imbriani, Susan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Clendenen, William)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Boccia on behalf of Maurice Maitland (Boccia, Joseph)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maurice Maitland re #6 Electronic Summons Issued, as to Robert Devlin (Clendenen, William)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maurice Maitland re #6 Electronic Summons Issued, as to John Wolf (Clendenen, William)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Ann Boyce Iassogna on behalf of Robert Devlin, John Wolf (Iassogna, Patricia Ann)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 ***ENTERED IN ERROR*** NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Aaron Yahwak on behalf of Robert Devlin, John Wolf (Yahwak, Joshua) Modified on 6/19/2019 (Imbriani, Susan).
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Aaron Yahwak on behalf of Robert Devlin, John Wolf (Yahwak, Joshua)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Robert Devlin, John Wolf* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William H. Clendenen, Jr.* *Clendenen & Shea* *400 Orange St.* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Gould, K.)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Maurice Maitland, #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 5/31/2019.(Gould, K.)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/30/2019.(Gould, K.)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/30/2019.(Gould, K.)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2019; Discovery due by 11/29/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 1/3/2020. Signed by Clerk on 5/30/2019.(Gould, K.)
May 30, 2019 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Oliver, T.)
May 30, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Clendenen, William)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Devlin, John Wolf ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5299080.), filed by Maurice Maitland.(Clendenen, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maitland v. Devlin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Devlin
Represented By: Patricia Ann Boyce Iassogna
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Yahwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wolf
Represented By: Patricia Ann Boyce Iassogna
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Yahwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Maitland
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Boccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?