Martins v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: David Martins
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00846
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 Jeep Wrangler Emergency-Brake Incident Report by David Martins. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E, #6 Appendix F, #7 Appendix G, #8 Appendix H, #9 Appendix I, #10 Appendix J, #11 Appendix K, #12 Appendix L, #13 Appendix M, #14 Appendix N)(Bozek, M.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Order re: Subpoena for Disclosure of Occupant Restraint Controller (ORC) Crash-Data by David Martins. (Attachments: #1 Appendix J)(Bozek, M.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Update/Revise Compensatory Cost/Monitary Costs by David Martins.Responses due by 8/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Bozek, M.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed/ Affidavit of Service by David Martins. FCA US LLC served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Bozek, M.)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *FCA US LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *David Martins* *1317 East Street Apt-520* *New Britain, CT 06053-2584*. (Murphy, Tatihana) Modified on 7/10/2019 to remove the word "attorney" (Bozek, M.).
July 9, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to FCA US LLC. (Murphy, Tatihana)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 motion for order. The plaintiff has failed to articulate a basis for service by the federal marshal's service. The plaintiff shall effectuate service on or before July 12, 2019, or articulate a sufficient basis for the requested type of service of the complaint. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 06/28/19. (Covello, Alfred)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Order that Federal US Marshalls Serve a Process of Summons and Complaint by David Martins. (Bozek, M.)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by David Martins, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 6/5/2019.(Bozek, M.)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 6/3/2019.(Bozek, M.)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/2/2019. Discovery due by 12/3/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/7/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/3/2019.(Bozek, M.)
June 3, 2019 Filing fee received from David Martins: $400.00, receipt number CTXH00015665. (Bozek, M.)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, filed by David Martins. (Attachments: #1 Monetary Claim, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Appendix A, #8 Exhibit E)(Bozek, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martins v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Martins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?