Doyle v. Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Doyle
Defendant: Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00854
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc. waiver sent on 6/10/2019, answer due 8/9/2019 filed by Michael Doyle. (Davison, Kenneth)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Michael Doyle, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, and #4 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 6/4/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/3/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/3/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/2/2019, Discovery due by 12/3/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 1/7/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/3/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
June 3, 2019 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5303645.), filed by Michael Doyle.(Davison, Kenneth) Modified on 6/3/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doyle v. Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Doyle
Represented By: Kenneth Raymond Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?