Caprio et al v. First Choice Payment Solutions G.P.
Plaintiff: Russel Caprio, Thor Colter and Marcia Iello
Defendant: First Choice Payment Solutions G.P.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00858
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 15, 2019(UNOPPOSED) to Respond to the Complaint #1 Complaint, by First Choice Payment Solutions G.P.. (Zaehringer, Kristen)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Luise Zaehringer on behalf of First Choice Payment Solutions G.P. (Zaehringer, Kristen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to First Choice Payment Solutions G.P. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019 filed by Russel Caprio; Thor Colter; Marcia Iello. (Lemberg, Sergei)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Thor Colter, Russel Caprio, Marcia Iello, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 06/05/19. (Barry, Donna)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 06/04/19.(Barry, Donna)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 06/04/19. (Barry, Donna)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/3/2019, Discovery due by 12/4/2019 and Dispositive Motions due by 1/8/2020 Signed by Clerk on 06/04/19. (Barry, Donna)
June 4, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Choice Payment Solutions G.P.,( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5304540.), filed by Russel Caprio, Marcia Iello, Thor Colter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lemberg, Sergei) Modified on 6/4/2019 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caprio et al v. First Choice Payment Solutions G.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Choice Payment Solutions G.P.
Represented By: Kristen Luise Zaehringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russel Caprio
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thor Colter
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Iello
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?