In re: Grebe Shipping LLC, et al

Petitioner: Eagle Ship Management LLC and Grebe Shipping LLC
Claimant: Gisel Medrano, Favors Kelcey, Ramos Juan, Gomez Alam, Boykin Island and Jose Luis Garcia
Counter Defendant: Elis Dolores Montoya, Lindsay Montoya, Francisco Aldair Montoya, Rubi Montoya, Montoya Aldair Francisco, Marlyn Montoya and Manuel De Jesus Calderon
3Rd Party Defendant: SK Shipping Co. Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00861
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION to Transfer to Another District CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 74 by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC. (Lennon, Patrick)
July 26, 2019 Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT re #74 MOTION to Transfer to Another District Signed By Patrick F. Lennon filed by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC. (Lennon, Patrick)
July 26, 2019 Filing 75 Memorandum in Support re #74 MOTION to Transfer to Another District filed by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC. (Lennon, Patrick)
July 26, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION to Transfer to Another District by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC. (Lennon, Patrick)
July 26, 2019 Filing 73 Joint MOTION To Lift Stay Order by Ramos Juan.Responses due by 8/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Longshore Claimants' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Lift, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, Rubi Montoya Suit, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, Claimants' Joint Stipulation)(Hand, William)
July 18, 2019 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #65 MOTION for Attorney(s) John W. Stevenson, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5360025) by Ramos Juan. (Stevenson, John)
July 18, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Stevenson, Jr on behalf of Ramos Juan Jose Garcia, Kelcey Favors, Island Boykin, Gisel Medrano and Alam Gomez (Stevenson, John)
July 18, 2019 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #66 MOTION for Attorney(s) William Robert Hand to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5360031) by Gomez Alam. (Hand, William)
July 18, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by William Robert Hand on behalf of Gomez Alam Juan Ramos, Jose Garcia, Kelcey Favors, Island Boykin and Gisel Medrano (Hand, William)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William Robert Hand. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/14/2019. Signed by Clerk on 7/16/19. (Imbriani, Susan)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #65 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John W. Stevenson, Jr. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/14/2019. Signed by Clerk on 7/16/19. (Imbriani, Susan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION for Attorney(s) William Robert Hand to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5360031) by Gomez Alam, Jose Luis Garcia, Boykin Island, Ramos Juan, Favors Kelcey, Gisel Medrano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" (Affidavit of William Robert Hand))(Fulweiler, John)
July 15, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for Attorney(s) John W. Stevenson, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5360025) by Gomez Alam, Jose Luis Garcia, Boykin Island, Ramos Juan, Favors Kelcey, Gisel Medrano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" (Affidavit of John W. Stevenson, Jr.))(Fulweiler, John)
July 15, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by John K. Fulweiler on behalf of Gomez Alam, Jose Luis Garcia, Boykin Island, Ramos Juan, Favors Kelcey, Gisel Medrano (Fulweiler, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Slack on behalf of Manuel De Jesus Calderon, Montoya Aldair Francisco, Francisco Aldair Montoya, Lindsay Montoya, Marlyn Montoya, Rubi Montoya, Elis Dolores Montoya (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Michael L. Slack)(Slack, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Eugene Deitz on behalf of SK Shipping Co. Ltd. (Deitz, Adam)
June 26, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Canevari on behalf of SK Shipping Co. Ltd. (Canevari, Thomas)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Peter K. Taaffe. Signed by Clerk on 6/24/19. (Imbriani, Susan)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael L. Slack. Signed by Clerk on 6/24/19. (Imbriani, Susan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Attorney(s) Peter K. Taaffe to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5330079) by Manuel De Jesus Calderon, Montoya Aldair Francisco, Francisco Aldair Montoya, Lindsay Montoya, Marlyn Montoya, Rubi Montoya, Elis Dolores Montoya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Peter K. Taaffe)(Nastri, Kathleen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael L. Slack to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5330077) by Manuel De Jesus Calderon, Montoya Aldair Francisco, Francisco Aldair Montoya, Lindsay Montoya, Marlyn Montoya, Rubi Montoya, Elis Dolores Montoya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Michael Slack)(Nastri, Kathleen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen L. Nastri on behalf of Manuel De Jesus Calderon, Montoya Aldair Francisco, Francisco Aldair Montoya, Lindsay Montoya, Marlyn Montoya, Rubi Montoya, Elis Dolores Montoya (Nastri, Kathleen)
June 17, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick F. Lennon on behalf of Grebe Shipping LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC (Lennon, Patrick)
May 30, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE TO COUNSEL IN TRANSFERRED CASE. Signed by Clerk on 5/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 30, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 5/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 30, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 5/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2019. Discovery due by 11/29/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/3/2020. Signed by Clerk on 5/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 30, 2019 Filing 48 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00211. Modified on 6/4/2019 TO CORRECT THE DATE FILED (Oliver, T.).
May 30, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut. Case transferred electronically, filed. (bthomas, 4)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot #19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Submission Date and Motion for Leave to Conduct Preliminary Discovery, and granting #15 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue and transferring this case to the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified.(cjan, 4)
May 28, 2019 Filing 46 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC, filed.(Klawetter, Robert)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Entry of Order Noting Defaults. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
May 24, 2019 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Noting DefaultsMotions referred to Christina A Bryan. by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schovajsa, Christina)
May 23, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene W. Barr on behalf of SK Shipping Co. Ltd., filed. (Barr, Eugene)
May 22, 2019 Filing 42 SK Shipping Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Juan Luis Garcia's Claim of Damages by SK Shipping Co. Ltd., filed.(Walker, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 41 SK Shipping Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Juan Ramos' Claim of Damages by SK Shipping Co. Ltd., filed.(Walker, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 40 SK Shipping Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Alam Gomez's Claim of Damages by SK Shipping Co. Ltd., filed.(Walker, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 39 SK Shipping Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Island Boykin's Claim of Damages by SK Shipping Co. Ltd., filed.(Walker, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 38 SK Shipping Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Kelcey Favors' Claim of Damages by SK Shipping Co. Ltd., filed.(Walker, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 37 SK Shipping Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Gisel Medrano's Claim of Damages by SK Shipping Co. Ltd., filed.(Walker, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 36 SK Shipping Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Montoya Family's Claim of Damages by SK Shipping Co. Ltd., filed.(Walker, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to #29 Third Party Complaint by SK Shipping Co. Ltd., filed.(Walker, David)
May 16, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by SK Shipping Co. Ltd., filed.(Walker, David)
May 9, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Gomez Alam, filed.(Hand, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition to #19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Submission Date and Motion for Leave to Conduct Preliminary Discovery, filed by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klawetter, Robert)
May 8, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to #15 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue, filed by Gomez Alam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Grebe Bulker Vessel Info, #2 Exhibit 2018 Annual Report)(Hand, William)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
May 1, 2019 Filing 29 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against SK Shipping Co. Ltd. filed by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC.(Klawetter, Robert)
May 1, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #15 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Klawetter, Robert)
April 30, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #17 Answer to Complaint , filed by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC. (Klawetter, Robert)
April 30, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to #14 Answer to Complaint , filed by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC. (Klawetter, Robert)
April 30, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #13 Answer to Complaint , filed by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC. (Klawetter, Robert)
April 30, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #12 Answer to Complaint , filed by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC. (Klawetter, Robert)
April 30, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #11 Answer to Complaint , filed by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC. (Klawetter, Robert)
April 30, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #10 Answer to Complaint , filed by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC. (Klawetter, Robert)
April 30, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #9 Answer to Complaint , filed by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC. (Klawetter, Robert)
April 30, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #16 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, , filed by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC. (Klawetter, Robert)
April 30, 2019 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Submission Date and Motion for Leave to Conduct Preliminary Discovery by Gomez Alam, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Hand, William)
April 30, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Montoya Aldair Francisco, Francisco Aldair Montoya, Lindsay Montoya, Marlyn Montoya, Rubi Montoya, Elis Dolores Montoya, filed.(Taaffe, Peter)
April 24, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U. S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate is available by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, filed. (bthomas, 4)
April 12, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SK Shipping Co. Ltd., filed.(Walker, David)
April 11, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Rubi Montoya, Elis Dolores Montoya, Francisco Aldair Montoya, Manuel De Jesus Calderon, Marlyn Montoya, Lindsay Montoya by Rubi Montoya, Montoya Aldair Francisco, Elis Dolores Montoya, Francisco Aldair Montoya, Manuel De Jesus Calderon, Marlyn Montoya, Lindsay Montoya, filed.(Taaffe, Peter)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue by Gomez Alam, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, Rubi Montoya Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, In re Red Circle Transport, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, Complait of Tug Daneille Bourchard Corp., #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, In the Matter of Western Atlas International, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, In re Falcon Drilling Co)(Hand, William)
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jose Luis Garcia, filed.(Hand, William)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Favors Kelcey, filed.(Hand, William)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ramos Juan, filed.(Hand, William)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gomez Alam, filed.(Hand, William)
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Boykin Island, filed.(Hand, William)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gisel Medrano, filed.(Hand, William)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Memorandum and Order Regarding Discovery Motions, Motions for Summary Judgment and Analogous Motions to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Compliance and Certificate of Publication by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schovajsa, Christina)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC, filed.(Schovajsa, Christina)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Ex Parte MOTION For Order Approving Issuance of Monition to Claimants and Restraining Prosecution of Claims and Order of Entry of Stipulation of Value. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/7/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION For Order Approving Issuance of Monition to Claimants and Restraining Prosecution of Claims and Order of Entry of Stipulation of Value by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klawetter, Robert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 STIPULATION re: Value by Eagle Ship Management LLC, Grebe Shipping LLC, filed.(Klawetter, Robert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Parties (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21685571) filed by Grebe Shipping LLC, Eagle Ship Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Klawetter, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Grebe Shipping LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gisel Medrano
Represented By: John W Stevenson, Jr
Represented By: William Robert Hand
Represented By: John K. Fulweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Favors Kelcey
Represented By: John W Stevenson, Jr
Represented By: William Robert Hand
Represented By: John K. Fulweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ramos Juan
Represented By: John W Stevenson, Jr
Represented By: William Robert Hand
Represented By: John K. Fulweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gomez Alam
Represented By: John W Stevenson, Jr
Represented By: William Robert Hand
Represented By: John K. Fulweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Boykin Island
Represented By: John W Stevenson, Jr
Represented By: William Robert Hand
Represented By: John K. Fulweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jose Luis Garcia
Represented By: John W Stevenson, Jr
Represented By: William Robert Hand
Represented By: John K. Fulweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eagle Ship Management LLC
Represented By: Patrick F. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Grebe Shipping LLC
Represented By: Patrick F. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Elis Dolores Montoya
Represented By: Kathleen L. Nastri
Represented By: Michael L. Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Lindsay Montoya
Represented By: Kathleen L. Nastri
Represented By: Michael L. Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Francisco Aldair Montoya
Represented By: Kathleen L. Nastri
Represented By: Michael L. Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Rubi Montoya
Represented By: Kathleen L. Nastri
Represented By: Michael L. Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Montoya Aldair Francisco
Represented By: Kathleen L. Nastri
Represented By: Michael L. Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Marlyn Montoya
Represented By: Kathleen L. Nastri
Represented By: Michael L. Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Manuel De Jesus Calderon
Represented By: Kathleen L. Nastri
Represented By: Michael L. Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: SK Shipping Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Adam Eugene Deitz
Represented By: Thomas M. Canevari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?