Selective Insurance Company of America et al v. Centerplan Construction Co., LLC et al
Plaintiff: Selective Insurance Company of America and Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Defendant: Dono Hartford, LLC, Ken Watterworth, Inc, Green Comfort LLC, Commercial Flooring Concepts, Inc, Orion Manufacturing Inc. and Centerplan Construction Co., LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00866
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by All Plaintiffs (Budinetz, James)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Centerplan Construction Co., LLC, Commercial Flooring Concepts, Inc, Dono Hartford, LLC, Green Comfort LLC, Ken Watterworth, Inc, Orion Manufacturing Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James A. Budinetz* *McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP* *One State Street, 14th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina Signed by Clerk on 6/5/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/4/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/4/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/3/2019. Discovery due by 12/4/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/8/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/4/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 4, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc. for Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (Budinetz, James)
June 4, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Budinetz, James)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5305353.), filed by Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Budinetz, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selective Insurance Company of America et al v. Centerplan Construction Co., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selective Insurance Company of America
Represented By: James A. Budinetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Represented By: James A. Budinetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dono Hartford, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Watterworth, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Comfort LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Flooring Concepts, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orion Manufacturing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerplan Construction Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?