Mazur v. Amica Mutual Ins Co
Plaintiff: Terri-Gayle Mazur
Defendant: Amica Mutual Ins Co
Case Number: 3:2019cv00871
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: William I Garfinkel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference held on 7/31/2019, (Settlement Conference set for 9/5/2019 @2:00 PM until 5:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 4th Floor, Room 435, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel shall check in with Judge Garfinkel's chambers, room 429 prior to the conference. THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IS ATTACHED FOR REVIEW). 15 minutes (Sanders, C.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference set for 7/31/2019 @1:30 PM before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, contact Chambers at 203-579-5593. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 190 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. This telephone conference will not be rescheduled based on requests from counsel. If counsel is not available at the scheduled time, please arrange for coverage by another lawyer who will have the necessary background knowledge to participate. (Sanders, C.)
July 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 4/3/2020. Post-discovery Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/14/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden; Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2020. Trial Brief due by 8/7/2020. (Ryan, Sarah)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 07/09/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 07/09/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Scheduling Conference held on 7/8/2019. (3 minutes. Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Ryan, Sarah)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 Set Deadlines/Hearings: NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 2:00 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. (Ryan, Sarah)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Newbury, Philip)
June 25, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/25/2019 (Perez, J.)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Amica Mutual Ins Co.(Newbury, Philip)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Pettinicchi on behalf of Terri-Gayle Mazur (Pettinicchi, Thomas)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Choity Khan on behalf of Amica Mutual Ins Co, #10 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Amica Mutual Ins Co, #7 Jury Demand filed by Amica Mutual Ins Co, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Amica Mutual Ins Co, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Philip T. Newbury, Jr on behalf of Amica Mutual Ins Co, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Compliance with Standing Order in Removed Cases filed by Amica Mutual Ins Co, #5 Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal filed by Amica Mutual Ins Co, #3 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Amica Mutual Ins Co, #11 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/5/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/5/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/4/2019. Discovery due by 12/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/9/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/5/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 5, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Choity Khan on behalf of Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Khan, Choity)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Newbury, Philip)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Newbury, Philip)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Amica Mutual Insurance Company Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal)(Newbury, Philip)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Amica Mutual Insurance Company Compliance with Standing Order in Removed Cases (Newbury, Philip)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Amica Mutual Insurance Company Notice of Pending Motions (Newbury, Philip)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip T. Newbury, Jr on behalf of Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Newbury, Philip)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amica Mutual Insurance Company from Judicial District of Waterbury at Waterbury, case number UWY-CV19-6048273-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5306571, filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Return of service)(Newbury, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mazur v. Amica Mutual Ins Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amica Mutual Ins Co
Represented By: Philip T. Newbury, Jr.
Represented By: Choity Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri-Gayle Mazur
Represented By: Thomas P. Pettinicchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?