Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Boston Irish, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Capizzi Music Co., Gary S. Paxton Publications, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Dimensional Music Publishing LLC, Hollenbeck Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Forrest Richard Betts Music, Unichappell Music, Inc., Rondor Music Intl Inc and Escatawpa Songs, LLC
Defendant: Boston Irish, Inc. and Robert O'Connor
Case Number: 3:2019cv00877
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Forrest Richard Betts Music, Capizzi Music Co., Rondor Music Intl Inc, Songs of Universal, Inc., Unichappell Music, Inc., Hollenbeck Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Gary S. Paxton Publications, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Dimensional Music Publishing LLC. Robert O'Connor served on 6/22/2019, answer due 7/13/2019. (Rye, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Forrest Richard Betts Music, Capizzi Music Co., Rondor Music Intl Inc, Songs of Universal, Inc., Unichappell Music, Inc., Hollenbeck Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Gary S. Paxton Publications, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Dimensional Music Publishing LLC. Boston Irish, Inc. served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Rye, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc., Capizzi Music Co., Dimensional Music Publishing LLC, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Forrest Richard Betts Music, Gary S. Paxton Publications, Inc., Hollenbeck Music, Rondor Music Intl Inc, Songs of Universal, Inc., Unichappell Music, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc., Capizzi Music Co., Dimensional Music Publishing LLC, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Forrest Richard Betts Music, Gary S. Paxton Publications, Inc., Hollenbeck Music, Rondor Music Intl Inc, Songs of Universal, Inc., Unichappell Music, Inc.. (Rye, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. E-mail sent to the Copyright Office directly. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Attachment) (Murphy, Tatihana)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Robert O'Connor* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael J. Rye* *Cantor Colburn LLP - Htfd* *20 Church Street, 22nd Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Boston Irish, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael J. Rye* *Cantor Colburn LLP - Htfd* *20 Church Street, 22nd Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Gary S. Paxton Publications, Inc., Dimensional Music Publishing LLC, Capizzi Music Co., Hollenbeck Music, Rondor Music Intl Inc, Unichappell Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Forrest Richard Betts Music, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 06/10/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/06/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/6/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/5/2019. Discovery due by 12/6/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2020. Signed by Clerk on 06/6/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 6, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 6, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Robert O'Connor. (Rye, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Boston Irish, Inc.. (Rye, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boston Irish, Inc., Robert O'Connor ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5308557.), filed by Forrest Richard Betts Music, Capizzi Music Co., Rondor Music International, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Unichappell Music, Inc., Hollenbeck Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Gary S. Paxton Publications, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Dimensional Music Publishing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Song Schedule)(Rye, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Boston Irish, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capizzi Music Co.
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary S. Paxton Publications, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dimensional Music Publishing LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollenbeck Music
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forrest Richard Betts Music
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unichappell Music, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music Intl Inc
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Escatawpa Songs, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Irish, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?