Milford v. Federal Emergency Management Agency et al
Plaintiff: City of Milford
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency and Pete T Gaynor
Case Number: 3:2019cv00883
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Milford. Federal Emergency Management Agency served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019; Pete T Gaynor served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Slossberg, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Federal Emergency Management Agency, Pete T Gaynor* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *David A. Slossberg* *Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC* *147 North Broad St.* *Milford, CT 06460-0112*. (Barry, Donna)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by City of Milford, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 06/11/19. (Barry, Donna)
June 11, 2019 Docket Entry Correction: #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines was entered in this case in error. (Barry, Donna)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 06/06/19. (Barry, Donna)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 06/06/19. (Barry, Donna)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR: Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/5/2019, Discovery due by 12/6/2019 and Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2020. Signed by Clerk on 06/06/19. (Barry, Donna) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (Barry, Donna).
June 6, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 6, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Slossberg, David)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5309634.), filed by City of Milford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Slossberg, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milford v. Federal Emergency Management Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Milford
Represented By: David A. Slossberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete T Gaynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?