Walker v. Accenture, PLC et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Walker
Defendant: Accenture, PLC and Accenture, LLP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00888
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 32 Memorandum in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:18-01602 Bayat v. Accenture, for all purposes filed by Accenture, LLP, Accenture, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Bayat EEOC Charge), #2 Exhibit 2 (Walker EEOC Charge), #3 Exhibit 3 (Walker Notice of Right to Sue), #4 Affidavit Declaration of Rokia Wagner, #5 Affidavit Declaration of B. Aubrey Smith, #6 Exhibit A to Smith Declaration, #7 Exhibit B to Smith Declaration, #8 Affidavit Declaration of Shelly Amick, #9 Exhibit A to Amick Declaration)(Cohen, Evan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Schwartz on behalf of Accenture, LLP, Accenture, PLC (Schwartz, Jason)
July 31, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Mylan L. Denerstein on behalf of Accenture, LLP, Accenture, PLC (Denerstein, Mylan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabrielle Levin on behalf of Accenture, LLP, Accenture, PLC (Levin, Gabrielle)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jason C. Schwartz. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mylan L. Denerstein. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jason C. Schwartz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5367985) by Accenture, LLP, Accenture, PLC. (Cohen, Evan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mylan L. Denerstein to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5367978) by Accenture, LLP, Accenture, PLC. (Cohen, Evan)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/11/2019.(Perez, J.)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Victor A. Bolden for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 07/08/19. (Barry, Donna)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting Motion #16 to stay all other deadlines pending briefing and decision on the Motion to Consolidate #14 , on consent and for good cause shown. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/3/19.(Kolker, J.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Accenture, LLP identifying Corporate Parent Accenture plc for Accenture, LLP. (Cohen, Evan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Accenture, PLC. (Cohen, Evan)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 MOTION for Attorney Gabrielle Levin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/3/2019. (Reis, Julia)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gabrielle Levin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5344504) by Accenture, LLP, Accenture, PLC. (Cohen, Evan)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time, on consent, in part. Opposition to Motion to Consolidate shall be filed by 8/2/19; any reply shall be filed by 8/16/19. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/1/19. (Tooker, A.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 2, 2019 and August 26, 2019 for Defendants to file response to motion to consolidate and plaintiff to file a reply to motion to consolidate #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:18-01602 Bayat v. Accenture, for all purposes by Accenture, LLP, Accenture, PLC. (Cohen, Evan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan I. Cohen on behalf of Accenture, LLP, Accenture, PLC (Cohen, Evan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:18-01602 Bayat v. Accenture, for all purposes by Matthew Walker.Responses due by 7/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - DOJ Press Release, #3 Exhibit 2 - Bayat Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 - Discovery Letter, #5 Exhibit 4 - Bayat Answer, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Appendix of Unreported Cases)(Von Klemperer, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael von Klemperer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5323026) by Matthew Walker. (Von Klemperer, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Walker. Accenture, LLP served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; Accenture, PLC served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Von Klemperer, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Von Klemperer on behalf of Matthew Walker (Von Klemperer, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Attorney Michael von Klemperer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/17/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/18/2019. (Reis, Julia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael von Klemperer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5323026) by Matthew Walker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael von Klemperer)(Reilly, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Matthew Walker Regarding Initial Discovery Protocols (Reilly, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Accenture, LLP, Accenture, PLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael John Reilly* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Reis, Julia)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Matthew Walker, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Attachment)(Reis, Julia)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/7/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/7/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/6/2019 Discovery due by 12/7/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 1/11/2020 Signed by Clerk on 6/7/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 7, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
June 7, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Reilly, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5310497.), filed by Matthew Walker.(Reilly, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Accenture, PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Walker
Represented By: Michael John Reilly
Represented By: Michael Von Klemperer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accenture, PLC
Represented By: Evan I. Cohen
Represented By: Mylan L. Denerstein
Represented By: Gabrielle Levin
Represented By: Jason Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accenture, LLP
Represented By: Evan I. Cohen
Represented By: Mylan L. Denerstein
Represented By: Gabrielle Levin
Represented By: Jason Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?