Interstate Billing Service, Inc. v. Precise Medical Billings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Interstate Billing Service, Inc.
Defendant: Precise Medical Billings, LLC, Patricia Riccardi and Anthony Riccardi
Case Number: 3:2019cv00909
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P. Nichols on behalf of Precise Medical Billings, LLC, Anthony Riccardi, Patricia Riccardi (Nichols, Jeffrey)
July 18, 2019 Filing 35 WRIT of Execution Issued. (Reis, Julia)
July 17, 2019 Filing 34 APPLICATION for Writ of Execution Property by Interstate Billing Service, Inc.. (Moran, William)
July 11, 2019 Filing 33 RULING: The court GRANTS the #31 Motion to Dissolve the Automatic Stay Provision of Fed. R. Civ. P. 62(a). Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/11/2019. (Lewis, D)
July 8, 2019 Filing 32 First OBJECTION re #28 Affidavit, 29 Order to Show Cause, filed by Precise Medical Billings, LLC, Anthony Riccardi, Patricia Riccardi. (Beck, Kenneth)
July 3, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Dissolve Rule 62(a) Automatic Stay by Interstate Billing Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William M. Moran in Support of Application to Dissolve Rule 62(a) Automatic Stay)(Moran, William)
June 27, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Lewis, D)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/27/2019.(DeRubeis, B.)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendants Precise Medical Billings, LLC, Anthony Riccardi, and Patricia Riccardi are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why, in accordance with the settlement agreement, an order granting Plaintiff, Interstate Medical Billing, Inc., judgment should not enter. Defendants are ORDERED to file any response to this ORDER by 12:00PM on JUNE 27, 2019. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/26/2019. (Show Cause Response due by 6/27/2019) (DeRubeis, B.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Cassandra Bomar In Support of Application of Entry of Judgment Due to Failure of Defendants to Comply with Settlement Agreement Signed By Cassandra Bomar filed by Interstate Billing Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., #2 Exhibit B.)(Costa, Keith)
June 21, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard G. Haddad to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5330786) by Interstate Billing Service, Inc.. (Costa, Keith)
June 20, 2019 Filing 26 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Held on June 20, 2019 before Judge Janet C. Hall. Court Reporter: Terri Fidanza. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/21/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/18/2019. (Fidanza, T.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION., Continued Hearing re #2 EXPARTE MOTION set for 7/10/2019 12:00 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (Lewis, D)
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Motion Hearing held on 6/20/2019 re #2 EXPARTE MOTION filed by Interstate Billing Service, Inc. Hearing continued to 7/10 @ noon; parties reached a tentative settlement agreement; parties to notify chambers if filing dismissal papers and hearing is not needed. 8 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D)
June 20, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/31/2019 (Lewis, D)
June 19, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) William M. Moran to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5319163) by Interstate Billing Service, Inc.. (Costa, Keith)
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Held on June 17, 2019 before Judge Janet C. Hall. Court Reporter: Terri Fidanza. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2019. (Fidanza, T.)
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order to Show Cause; Affidavit of Cassandra Bomar in Support of Order To Show Cause with Exhibits A through F; Emergency Affirmation of William M. Moran;Complaint with Exhibit A,C and E; Memorandum of Law of Interstate Billing Service, Inc. in Support of Motion for an Order of Attachment, etc.; Civil Cover Sheet; and Court Rules of the USDC/D. Conn. served on Precise Medical Billings, Anthony Riccardi & Patricia Riccardi on June 12, 2019 via Federal Express, filed by Interstate Billing Service, Inc.. (Costa, Keith)
June 18, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order to Show Cause; Affidavit of Cassandra Bomar in Support of Order To Show Cause with Exhibits A through F; Emergency Affirmation of William M. Moran;Complaint with Exhibit A,C and E; Memorandum of Law of Interstate Billing Service, Inc. in Support of Motion for an Order of Attachment, etc.; Civil Cover Sheet; and Court Rules of the USDC/D. Conn. served on Precise Medical Billing, LLC on June 13, 2019, filed by Interstate Billing Service, Inc.. (Costa, Keith)
June 18, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order to Show Cause; Affidavit of Cassandra Bomar in Support of Order To Show Cause with Exhibits A through F; Emergency Affirmation of William M. Moran;Complaint with Exhibit A,C and E; Memorandum of Law of Interstate Billing Service, Inc. in Support of Motion for an Order of Attachment, etc.; Civil Cover Sheet; and Court Rules of the USDC/D. Conn. served on Patricia Riccardi on June 13, 2019, filed by Interstate Billing Service, Inc.. (Costa, Keith)
June 18, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order to Show Cause; Affidavit of Cassandra Bomar in Support of Order To Show Cause with Exhibits A through F; Emergency Affirmation of William M. Moran;Complaint with Exhibit A,C and E; Memorandum of Law of Interstate Billing Service, Inc. in Support of Motion for an Order of Attachment, etc.; Civil Cover Sheet; and Court Rules of the USDC/D. Conn. served on Anthony Riccardi on June 13, 2019, filed by Interstate Billing Service, Inc.. (Costa, Keith)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 Marked Exhibit List. (Lewis, D)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Motion Hearing held on 6/17/2019 re #2 EXPARTE MOTION filed by Interstate Billing Service, Inc. ; Show Cause Hearing held on 6/17/2019. taking under advisement #2 ExParte Motion; the court issues a PJR against defendants Precise Medical Billings and Anthony Riccardi with an attachment in the amount of $2.5 million; cash bond in the amount of $200,000 to be posted; depositions to be scheduled immediately; dfts required to produce documents; dft to produce any evidence supporting his representations to plaintiff, if any. Further hearing scheduled for Thursday, 6/20 at 11:00 a.m. Total Time: 1 hours and 27 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Continued Show Cause Hearing set for 6/20/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (Lewis, D)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear pro hac vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/16/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/17/2019. (Lewis, D)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Alan Beck on behalf of Precise Medical Billings, LLC, Anthony Riccardi, Patricia Riccardi (Beck, Kenneth)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO #8 Order to Show Cause,, by Precise Medical Billings, LLC, Anthony Riccardi, Patricia Riccardi filed by Precise Medical Billings, LLC, Anthony Riccardi, Patricia Riccardi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit w/exhibits, #2 Affidavit w/attachments)(Beck, Kenneth)
June 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF AMENDED E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 6/17/2019. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/17/2019 has been changed to 3:30 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (DeRubeis, B.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) William M. Moran to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5319163) by Interstate Billing Service, Inc.. (Costa, Keith)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/17/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (DeRubeis, B.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendants Precise Medical Billings, LlC, Anthony Riccardi and Patricia Riccardi are hereby ordered to show cause why an order should not be entered granting a preliminary injunction enjoining and restraining defendants, directing defendants to turn over to plaintiff all records pertaining to their contracts and accounts receivable pledged to plaintiffs, granting an order of attachment and allowing depositions. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/17/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/12/2019.(Lewis, D)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Interstate Billing Service, Inc., #5 Standing Protective Order, #6 Standing Order Re: Discovery, #2 EXPARTE MOTION filed by Interstate Billing Service, Inc., #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 6/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER RE: DISCOVERY Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/11/2019. Discovery due by 12/12/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/16/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE MOTION by Interstate Billing Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Emergency Affirmation of William M. Moran, #3 Affidavit of Casandra Bomar)(Fazekas, J.)
June 12, 2019 Filing fee received from William Moran: $400.00, receipt number CTXB00010279. (Fazekas, J.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Precise Medical Billings, LLC, Anthony Riccardi, Patricia Riccardi, filed by Interstate Billing Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Interstate Billing Service, Inc. v. Precise Medical Billings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precise Medical Billings, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Alan Beck
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Riccardi
Represented By: Kenneth Alan Beck
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Riccardi
Represented By: Kenneth Alan Beck
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interstate Billing Service, Inc.
Represented By: Keith N. Costa
Represented By: William M. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?