Sardarian v. Federal Emergency Management Agency et al
Plaintiff: Arkady Sardarian
Defendant: Connecticut, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, William J. Hackett, Dean J. Savramis, Town of Westport, Robert E. Yost, Andrew Kingsbury, Emergency Management & Homeland Security, Michael Onofrio, Ken Dumais, Gemma Fabris, Jim Marpe and Michele Onofrio
Case Number: 3:2019cv00910
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying as moot #17 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will issue a written scheduling order, setting specific case deadlines, after the parties file their joint Rule 26(f) Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 26(f), Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. To compile that report, the attorneys of record and any self-represented parties confer (within 30 day after the first appearance of a defendant) to propose case deadlines to the Court and then file their joint report within fourteen (14) days after the conference. Until the Court receives that report and sets those deadlines, the preliminary deadlines set forth in the standard "Order on Pretrial Deadlines" are in effect. Those preliminary deadlines, however, do not begin to run until after the appearance of one or more defendants in the action. See Doc. #2 ("Order on Pretrial Deadlines"), at 1, para.(a)(i). Here, the Plaintiff has indicated that the summons and complaint are scheduled to be served on defendants on or about September 3, 2019, so that no defendant has yet appeared in the action. Therefore, Plaintiff has no need for an extension of deadlines at this time. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on August 2, 2019. (Dorais, L.)
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time by Arkady Sardarian. (Sardarian, Arkady)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Robert E. Yost* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Arkady Sardarian* *11 Vineyard Lane* *Westport, CT 06880*. (Walker, J.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Federal Emergency Management Agency, Dean J. Savramis* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. *Arkady Sardarian* *11 Vineyard Lane* *Westport, CT 06880*. (Walker, J.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ken Dumais, Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, Gemma Fabris, William J. Hackett, Andrew Kingsbury, Jim Marpe, Michele Onofrio, Town of Westport* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Arkady Sardarian* *11 Vineyard Lane* *Westport, CT 06880*. (Walker, J.)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 6/19/2019.(Freberg, B)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 RULING (see attached) denying #7 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff is not indigent so is not a person who is "unable to afford counsel" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on June 19, 2019. (Dorais, L.)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing. Because Plaintiff has indicated compliance with all elements required by a self-represented litigant to participate in electronic filing ("e-filing"), his #6 Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff is reminded that, as he has represented, he must complete the required training class on e-filing and register for a PACER account before he files his first electronic document. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on June 19, 2019. (Dorais, L.)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 ENTERED IN ERROR - ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ken Dumais, Gemma Fabris, William J. Hackett, Andrew Kingsbury, Jim Marpe, Michael Onofrio, Dean J. Savramis, Town of Westport, Robert E. Yost* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Arkady Sardarian, 11 Vineyard Lane, Westport, CT, 06880* (Corriette, M.) Modified on 6/28/2019 (Walker, J.).
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 ENTERED IN ERROR ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Emergency Management & Homeland Security, Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, Federal Emergency Management Agency* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. *Arkady Sardarian, 11 Vineyard Lane Westport, CT, 06880* (Corriette, M.) Modified on 6/28/2019(Walker, J.).
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Electronic Service Documents, #1 Complaint, filed by Arkady Sardarian, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Arkady Sardarian, #6 MOTION for by self-represented litigant to participate in electronic filing Order filed by Arkady Sardarian Signed by Clerk on 6/14/19.(Corriette, M.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR - ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ken Dumais, Emergency Management & Homeland Security, Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, Gemma Fabris, Federal Emergency Management Agency, William J. Hackett, Andrew Kingsbury, Jim Marpe, Michael Onofrio, Dean J. Savramis, Town of Westport, Robert E. Yost* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Arkady Sardarian, 11 Vineyard Lane, Westport, CT 06880* (Corriette, M.) Modified on 6/18/2019 (Corriette, M.).
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Arkady Sardarian. (Corriette, M.) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/18/2019) (Corriette, M.).
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by self-represented litigant to participate in electronic filing by Arkady Sardarian. (Corriette, M.)
June 12, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Ken Dumais, Emergency Management & Homeland Security, Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, Gemma Fabris, Federal Emergency Management Agency, William J. Hackett, Andrew Kingsbury, Jim Marpe, Michael Onofrio, Dean J. Savramis, Town of Westport, Robert E. Yost. (Corriette, M.).
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 ENTERED IN ERROR - NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Arkady Sardarian, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 6/12/19.(Corriette, M.) Modified on 6/18/2019 (Corriette, M.).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 6/12/19.(Corriette, M.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/11/2019 Discovery due by 12/12/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 1/16/2020 Signed by Clerk on 6/12/19.(Corriette, M.)
June 12, 2019 Filing fee received from Arkady Sardarian: $ 400.00, receipt number 467911 (Corriette, M.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Connecticut, Ken Dumais, Emergency Management & Homeland Security, Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, Gemma Fabris, Federal Emergency Management Agency, William J. Hackett, Andrew Kingsbury, Jim Marpe, Michael Onofrio, Dean J. Savramis, Town of Westport, filed by Arkady Sardarian.(Corriette, M.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2019: #1 Exhibit) (Corriette, M.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sardarian v. Federal Emergency Management Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean J. Savramis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Westport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Kingsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergency Management & Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Onofrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Dumais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemma Fabris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Marpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Onofrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkady Sardarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?