Beyonics International PTE LTD. v. Smith
Plaintiff: Beyonics International PTE LTD.
Defendant: Scott David Smith
Case Number: 3:2019cv00926
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM against Beyonics International PTE LTD. by Scott David Smith.(Goldstein, Evan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Scott David Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Evan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Scott David Smith. (Goldstein, Evan)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Scott David Smith by Beyonics International PTE LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John H. Hay, #2 Exhibit 1 to Hay Declaration, #3 Statement of Damages, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hay, John)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam B. Marks on behalf of Scott David Smith (Marks, Adam)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan S. Goldstein on behalf of Scott David Smith (Goldstein, Evan)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Request for Entry of Default pursuant to FRCP 55(a). A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed by 8/24/2019 or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a). Signed by Clerk on 7/25/2019. (Shafer, J.)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Scott David Smith by Beyonics International PTE LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Hay, #2 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default)(Hay, John)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beyonics International PTE LTD.. Scott David Smith served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Hay, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Scott David Smith* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John J. Hay* *Denton US LLP-NYC* *1221 Avenue of the Americas, 24th Fl.* *New York, NY 10020*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Beyonics International PTE LTD., #6 Standing Protective Order, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Beyonics International PTE LTD., #7 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #2 Exhibit filed by Beyonics International PTE LTD. Signed by Clerk on 06/14/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/14/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/14/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/14/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/13/2019. Discovery due by 12/14/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/18/2020. Signed by Clerk on 06/14/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 14, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beyonics International PTE LTD. identifying Corporate Parent Beyonics Technology Ltd. for Beyonics International PTE LTD.. (Hay, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT / CIVIL COVER SHEET by Beyonics International PTE LTD. re #1 Complaint. (Hay, John)
June 14, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Scott David Smith. (Hay, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scott David Smith ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5320185.), filed by Beyonics International PTE LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Hay, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of John Hay)(Hay, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beyonics International PTE LTD. v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott David Smith
Represented By: Adam B. Marks
Represented By: Evan S. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beyonics International PTE LTD.
Represented By: John J. Hay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?