Padewski v. Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Judith Padewski
Defendant: Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00929
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/16/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor the parties' compliance with Local Rule 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) provides that, within 30 days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for the purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) further provides that, within 14 days after the conference, the participants must jointly complete and file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). It appears that more than forty days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case, but no joint report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties file the required report on or before 8/16/2019. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/2/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc..(Simeonidis, Sara)
July 17, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc. to 7/29/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 7/29/2019 to respond to plaintiff's amended complaint dated 5/15/2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/17/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 29, 2019 in Which to Respond to Amended Complaint by Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc.. (Simeonidis, Sara)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sarah Wilber terminated. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/2/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Sarah L. Wilber to Withdraw as Attorney by Judith Padewski. (Wilber, Sarah)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/26/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #14 Notice, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., #11 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., #13 Protective Order, #12 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2019.(Pipech, L.)
June 19, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc. to 7/22/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 7/22/2019 to respond to plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/19/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 22, 2019 To Respond To Amended Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc.. (Simeonidis, Sara)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Wilber on behalf of Judith Padewski (Wilber, Sarah)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Rose on behalf of Judith Padewski (Rose, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Pipech, L.)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/14/2019.(Pipech, L.)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/14/2019.(Pipech, L.)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/13/2019; Discovery due by 12/14/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 1/18/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/14/2019.(Pipech, L.)
June 14, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Jimenez on behalf of Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc. (Jimenez, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Statement Regarding Removal (Simeonidis, Sara)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Pending Motions (Simeonidis, Sara)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing and Service of Petition of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Simeonidis, Sara)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara R. Simeonidis on behalf of Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc. (Simeonidis, Sara)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc. from CT Superior J.D. of Hartford at Hartford, case number HHD-CV-6103947-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5320952, filed by Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Simeonidis, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padewski v. Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Padewski
Represented By: Cindy M. Cieslak
Represented By: Michael J. Rose
Represented By: Sarah Wilber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Sara R. Simeonidis
Represented By: David R. Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?