Guarnera v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tanya Guarnera
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company, Dineley Claims Services, Inc. and Ale Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00931
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/16/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor the parties' compliance with Local Rule 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) provides that, within 30 days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for the purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) further provides that, within 14 days after the conference, the participants must jointly complete and file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). It appears that more than forty days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case, but no joint report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties file the required report on or before 8/16/2019. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/2/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 2, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Dineley Claims Services, Inc. to 9/13/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to 9/13/2019 to file a responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/2/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/13/2019 to plead to complaint by Dineley Claims Services, Inc.. (Szilagyi, Frank)
July 24, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Allstate Insurance Company to 9/13/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 9/13/2019 to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/24/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until September 13, 2019 to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company. (O'Malley, Denis)
July 23, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Ale Solutions, Inc. to 9/13/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Please see attached letter. The request to extend the deadline for ALE Solutions, Inc. to answer or move with respect to plaintiff's complaint is hereby granted to one week after the earlier of (1) the Court's decision on the application pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 or (2) one week after counsel's swearing in before the Court. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/23/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 28, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Dineley Claims Services, Inc. to 8/5/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 8/5/2019 to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/28/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 08/05/2019 to plead to complaint by Dineley Claims Services, Inc.. (Szilagyi, Frank)
June 20, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Allstate Insurance Company to 8/5/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 8/5/2019 to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/20/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 5, 2019 to answer or otherwise plead to complaint by Allstate Insurance Company. (O'Malley, Denis)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. LeMoult on behalf of Tanya Guarnera (LeMoult, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Allstate Insurance Company re #7 Protective Order Statement in Compliance with Standing Order in Removed Cases (O'Malley, Denis)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Insurance Company. (O'Malley, Denis)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Allstate Insurance Company, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Allstate Insurance Company, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Allstate Insurance Company, #7 Standing Protective Order, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Allstate Insurance Company, #6 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 06/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 06/14/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/14/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/14/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) Modified filed date on 6/18/2019 (Murphy, Tatihana).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2019. Discovery due by 12/17/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Clerk on 06/14/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) Modified filed date on 6/18/2019 (Murphy, Tatihana).
June 14, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond T. Demeo on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Demeo, Raymond)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Allstate Insurance Company of Pending Motions (O'Malley, Denis)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Allstate Insurance Company to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'Malley, Denis)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from JD of Danbury at Danbury, case number DBD-CV-19-6031569. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5321336, filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(O'Malley, Denis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guarnera v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Guarnera
Represented By: Michael J. LeMoult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Raymond T. Demeo
Represented By: Denis O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dineley Claims Services, Inc.
Represented By: Frank J. Szilagyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ale Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?