Reyes v. Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sandra Reyes
Defendant: Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00935
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Bifurcate and or Sever Bad Faith and CUTPA Counts for Purposes of Trial by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company.Responses due by 9/5/2019 (Mason, A.) Modified event type and docket text on 8/15/2019 (Pipech, L.).
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 3:30 PM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Counsel will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Please read full text of attached Order. Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2019; Discovery due by 3/1/2020; Initial Status Report due by 8/23/2019; Prefiling Conference Request Re: Dispositive Motions due 1/16/2020; Settlement Conference 4/2020; Trial Ready Date 9/1/2020; Trial Brief due by 7/1/2020. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/23/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Biller, Jon)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon David Biller on behalf of Sandra Reyes (Biller, Jon)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice (Other) filed by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Standing Protective Order, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 06/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 06/17/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/17/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/17/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2019. Discovery due by 12/17/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Clerk on 06/17/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 17, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company Corporate Disclosure Statement (Mason, A.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company Notice of Pending Motions (Mason, A.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company Statement on Removed Cases (Mason, A.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company from J.D. of Ansonia/Milford at Milford, case number AAN-CV-19-6033921-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5322702, filed by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company.(Mason, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Reyes
Represented By: Jon David Biller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: A. Richard Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?