Graphic Arts Mutual Ins Co v. Hotchkiss School
Plaintiff: Graphic Arts Mutual Insurance Company and Graphic Arts Mutual Ins Co
Defendant: The Hotchkiss School and Hotchkiss School
Case Number: 3:2019cv00946
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt B. Fliegauf on behalf of Graphic Arts Mutual Ins Co (Fliegauf, Kurt)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kurt B. Fliegauf to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5349577) by Graphic Arts Mutual Ins Co. (Conn, Russell)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion to appear. Certificate of good standing due by 9/7/2019. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 7/9/19. (Hall, Gregory)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kurt B. Fliegauf to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5349577) by Graphic Arts Mutual Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Conn, Russell)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kurt B. Fliegauf to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5348527) by Graphic Arts Mutual Ins Co. (Conn, Russell)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hotchkiss School. (Luttinger, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David A Luttinger, Jr on behalf of Hotchkiss School (Luttinger, David)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hotchkiss School waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019 filed by Graphic Arts Mutual Ins Co. (Conn, Russell)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Graphic Arts Mutual Ins Co. (Conn, Russell)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #1 Complaint, filed by Graphic Arts Mutual Ins Co. Signed by Clerk on 6/21/2019.(Bozek, M.)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 6/18/2019.(Bozek, M.)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/17/2019. Discovery due by 12/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/22/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/18/2019.(Bozek, M.)
June 18, 2019 Judge Alfred V. Covello and Judge Donna F. Martinez added. (Blough, B.)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hotchkiss School ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5325327.), filed by Graphic Arts Mutual Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Policy)(Conn, Russell) Modified on 6/19/2019 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graphic Arts Mutual Ins Co v. Hotchkiss School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hotchkiss School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotchkiss School
Represented By: David A Luttinger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graphic Arts Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Russell F Conn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graphic Arts Mutual Ins Co
Represented By: Russell F Conn
Represented By: Kurt B. Fliegauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?