Feliciano v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Edwin Feliciano
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00961
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Referring Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
2 Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/17/2019. (Shafer, J.)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, the case is reassigned to Judge Vanessa L. Bryant for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMINDER: STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Marie Del Colliano on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Del Colliano, Jean)
June 20, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Commissioner of Social Security to 8/19/2019. (Fazekas, J.) Modified on 6/21/2019 to correct date (Fazekas, J.).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/20/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/20/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.)
June 20, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill and Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. (Blough, B.)
June 20, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Edwin Feliciano against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5328429.), filed by Edwin Feliciano. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Pierre Pierre, Eddy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feliciano v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jean Marie Del Colliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Feliciano
Represented By: Eddy Pierre Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?