Kerwick v. Connecticut
Plaintiff: Colleen Kerwick and NiChairmhaic
Defendant: State of Connecticut
Case Number: 3:2019cv00966
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Alma Rose Nunley on behalf of State of Connecticut in addition to appearance of Robert J. Deichert (Nunley, Alma)
August 10, 2019 Filing 16 EXHIBIT Sworn Affidavit of Prof. Elizabeth Richter seeking to join in the request for relief requested herein by Atty. Colleen Ni Chairmhaic. The relief requested in the complaint herein is not for money damages. It is to STRIKE DOWN A MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING TO DISCRIMINATE AGAINST MOTHERS IN CHILD CUSTODY LITIGATION TO POSTURE FOR FUNDING FROM THE FATHERHOOD INITIATIVE. IT WAS SIGNED BY 9 STATE AGENCIES INCLUDING THE JUDICIAL BRANCH AND IS ANNEXED HERETO IN FULL. THE MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING TO DISCRIMINATE AGAINST MOTHERS DATED FEBRUARY 26, 2010 AND CONTINUING IS BOTH UNCONSTITUTIONAL AND IN VIOLATION OF INTERNATIONAL LAW by Colleen Kerwick re #15 Objection,,,,,, #1 Complaint, #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, #9 Notice (Other), #14 MOTION to Stay re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Requesting a Stay of the Parties' Rule 26 Requirements and All Discovery Pending a Decision on the State's Pending Motion to D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Understanding to prima facie discriminate against Mothers to posture for funding, signed by 9 State Agencies including the Judicial Branch)(Ni Chairmhaic, Colleen)
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 OBJECTION re #13 Notice (Other), #14 MOTION to Stay re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Requesting a Stay of the Parties' Rule 26 Requirements and All Discovery Pending a Decision on the State's Pending Motion to D as it mischarizes the complaint which only seeks to STRIKE DOWN A MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING SIGNED BY THE JUDICAL BRANCH ON FEBRUARY 26, 2000 AND CONTINUING WHICH PRIMA FACIE DISCRIMINATES AGAINST MOTHERS TO POSTURE FOR FUNDING FROM THE FATHERHOOD INITIATIVE. IT VIOLATES THE CONSTITUTION AND INTERNATIONAL LAW. ALSO THE PRIOR ACTION FILED BY THIS ATTORNEY IN 2014 UNDER THE ALIEN TORT CLAIMS ACT WAS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR NON SERVICE AS MOOT. THEREAFTER A MEMBER OF THE STATE GRIEVANCE PANEL OFFERED TO SUE THE OFFICER OF THE COURT WHO PERPETRATED A FRAUD ON THE COURT WHICH LED TO ANY DAMAGES IN THAT EARLIER CASE (RECOVERY IN THE STATE CASE TO BE DONATED TO THE STATE) THE INSTANT CASE DOES NOT SEEK MONEY DAMAGES AND NO CLAIM FOR RELIEF OF MONEY DAMAGES WAS ALLEGED. THE INSTANT CASE IS TO STRIKE DOWN A MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING AS UNCONSTITUTIONAL AND IN VIOLATION OF INTERNATIONAL LAW filed by Colleen Kerwick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. State Agreement to Discrminate against Women, #2 Exhibit B. State Grievance Officers offer to sue Atty Kukucka for fraud on the court by an officer of the court and malpractice. Any recovery to be fully donated to the State to improve the broken Family Courts)(Ni Chairmhaic, Colleen)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Requesting a Stay of the Parties' Rule 26 Requirements and All Discovery Pending a Decision on the State's Pending Motion to Dismiss by State of Connecticut.Responses due by 8/30/2019 (Deichert, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by State of Connecticut re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim to Pro Se Plaintiff Pursuant to Local Rule 12(a) (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 7, #2 FRCP 12)(Deichert, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by State of Connecticut.Responses due by 8/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Table of Contents for Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1--Ruling Dismissing 2014 Action, #4 Exhibit 2--Ruling Denying Reconsideration in 2014 Action, #5 Exhibit 3--the State's Motion to Dismiss in the 2014 Action, #6 Exhibit 4--State Court Docket Sheet in Family Action, #7 Exhibit 5--Recommended Ruling in Golli)(Deichert, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Deichert on behalf of State of Connecticut (Deichert, Robert)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colleen Kerwick. State of Connecticut served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Ni Chairmhaic, Colleen)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Colleen Kerwick re #1 Complaint, #8 Electronic Summons Issued, TO CLARIFY THAT NO CLAIM FOR MONEY DAMAGES IS ALLEGED. THIS IS AN ACTION SEEKING RELIEF OF STRIKING DOWN A MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING EXECUTED BY NINE STATE AGENCIES INCLUDING THE JUDICIAL BRANCH OF THE STATE OF CONNECTICUT WHICH EXPRESSLY AND UNEQUIVOCALLY REVERSE DISCRIMINATE AGAINST MOTHERS IN CHILD CUSTODY LITIGATION TO POSTURE FOR FUNDING FROM THE FATHERHOOD INITIATIVE. (Ni Chairmhaic, Colleen)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *State of Connecticut* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Colleen Mary Ni Chairmhaic* *Colleen Ni Chairmhaic* *1748-1 Farmington Ave.* *Unionville, CT 06085*. (Shafer, J.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #1 Complaint, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Standing Protective Order, and #2 Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum. Signed by Clerk on 6/24/2019. (Shafer, J.)
June 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Colleen Kerwick of Subpoena Duces Tecum (Ni Chairmhaic, Colleen)
June 22, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to State of Connecticut. (Ni Chairmhaic, Colleen)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/21/2019. (Shafer, J.)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/21/2019. (Shafer, J.)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/21/2019. (Shafer, J.)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/20/2019; Discovery due by 12/21/2019; and Dispositive Motions due by 1/25/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/21/2019. (Shafer, J.)
June 21, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Connecticut ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5329991.), filed by Colleen Kerwick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement to Prima Facie Reverse Discriminate against Mothers)(Ni Chairmhaic, Colleen) Modified on 6/21/2019 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerwick v. Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Kerwick
Represented By: Colleen Mary Ni Chairmhaic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NiChairmhaic
Represented By: Colleen Mary Ni Chairmhaic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Robert J. Deichert
Represented By: Alma Rose Nunley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?