Suckley v. Bioserv, Inc.
Plaintiff: Susan Suckley
Defendant: Bioserv, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00967
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pantuso, Anthony)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Bioserv, Inc..(Lynch, Edward)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward T. Lynch, Jr on behalf of Bioserv, Inc. (Lynch, Edward)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Suckley. Bioserv, Inc. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Pantuso, Anthony)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Susan Suckley Identification of Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases (Pantuso, Anthony)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Susan Suckley* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony J. Pantuso, III* *Law Offices of Anthony J. Pantuso, III* *4 Research Drive, Suite 402* *Shelton, CT 06484*. (Fazekas, J.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Susan Suckley, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 6/21/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE re: Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Protocols Form, #2 Order, Initial Discovery Protocols)(Fazekas, J.)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/21/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/21/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/20/2019. Discovery due by 12/21/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/25/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/21/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 21, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 21, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Bioserv, Inc.. (Pantuso, Anthony)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bioserv, Inc ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5329345.), filed by Susan Suckley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pantuso, Anthony) Modified text on 6/21/2019 correct parties (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suckley v. Bioserv, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bioserv, Inc.
Represented By: Edward T. Lynch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Suckley
Represented By: Anthony J. Pantuso, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?