Doe et al v. Trumbull Board of Education

Plaintiff: Doe
Defendant: Trumbull Board of Education
Case Number: 3:2019cv00979
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Trumbull Board of Education.(Buturla, Richard)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Buturla on behalf of Trumbull Board of Education (Buturla, Richard)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in Fictitious Name. For the reasons set forth in the Plaintiffs' supporting memorandum, (ECF No. 12), the Court agrees that the factors that courts are required to consider for use of a pseudonym in civil litigation weigh in favor of the Plaintiffs' continued anonymity in this matter. See Sealed Plaintiff v. Sealed Defendant, 537 F.3d 185 (2d Cir. 2008). Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/17/2019. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Proceed in Fictitious Name filed by Doe(Mr., by and for their minor child Jane Doe), Doe(Mrs., by and for their minor child Jane Doe). (Smith, Gregory)
July 12, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Defendant. Responsive pleading due 8/11/2019. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time until 8/11/19 to File an Answer to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/12/2019. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/11/19 to File an Answer to the Complaint #1 Complaint by Trumbull Board of Education. (Dugas, Floyd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Floyd Joseph Dugas on behalf of Trumbull Board of Education (Dugas, Floyd)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Within twenty-one days of serving the Defendant or filing a waiver of service, the Plaintiff shall file a memorandum of law in support of her #2 Motion to Proceed in Fictitious Name. See generally Sealed Plaintiff v. Sealed Defendant, 537 F.3d 185 (2d Cir. 2008) (setting forth legal standard for requests to proceed under pseudonym). In that memorandum, the Plaintiff shall further indicate the Defendant's position concerning her motion.Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/24/2019.(Beyerlein, Alexis)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Trumbull Board of Education* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gregory Smith* *19 Highview Ave.* *Norwalk, CT 06851* (Fazekas, J.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 MOTION to Proceed in Fictitious Name filed by Doe, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Doe, #5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 6/24/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/24/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/24/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/23/2019. Discovery due by 12/24/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/28/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/24/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 24, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in Fictitious Name by Mr. and Mrs. Doe. (Smith, Gregory)
June 24, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Trumbull Board of Education. (Smith, Gregory)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Trumbull Board of Education ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5331791.), filed by Mr. and Mrs. Doe. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)(Smith, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Trumbull Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doe
Represented By: Gregory Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trumbull Board of Education
Represented By: Richard J. Buturla
Represented By: Floyd Joseph Dugas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?