15 Mafre LLC v. Champion Mortgage et al

Plaintiff: 15 Mafre LLC
Defendant: Alfred Kalfus, Geraldine Kalfus and Champion Mortgage
Case Number: 3:2019cv00992
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Champion Mortgage, Alfred Kalfus, Geraldine Kalfus, filed by 15 Mafre LLC.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by 15 Mafre LLC, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 6/27/2019.(Freberg, B)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/25/2019.(Freberg, B)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/25/2019.(Freberg, B)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/24/2019; Discovery due by 12/25/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2020. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/25/2019.(Freberg, B)
June 25, 2019 Filing fee received from 15 Mafre LLC: $400, receipt number 153338 (Freberg, B)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Champion Mortgage, Alfred Kalfus, Geraldine Kalfus, filed by 15 Mafre LLC.(Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 15 Mafre LLC v. Champion Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 15 Mafre LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Kalfus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geraldine Kalfus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?