Mott Corp v. MEI Americas, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mott Corp
Defendant: Bin Huang and MEI Americas, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00993
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Gershenson Adam on behalf of Mott Corp (Adam, Gershenson)
August 22, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Matthew Koch on behalf of Mott Corp (Koch, Bryan)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam Gershenson, Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/21/2019. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam Gershenson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5408036) by Mott Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Adam Gershenson)(Gunningsmith, Damian)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bryan Koch, Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/20/2019. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bryan Koch to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5406533) by Mott Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Bryan Koch)(Gunningsmith, Damian)
August 9, 2019 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #35 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kroopa S. Desai to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5368922) by MEI Americas, LLC. (Desai, Kroopa)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order in Support of Preliminary Injunction Hearing. See order attached. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/8/2019. (Bempong, Tracy)
August 7, 2019 Filing 55 Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order in support of Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Mott Corp.Responses due by 8/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(McMahon, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Set Deadlines: Plaintiff's reply to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction and objection to the Motion to Dismiss due by September 4, 2019. The Defendant's reply to the Motion to Dismiss due by September 18, 2019. (Bempong, Tracy)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 The Court grants the Plaintiff's request for extension of time made during the August 6, 2019 telephonic status conference and orders as follows: The Plaintiff's reply to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be filed by September 4, 2019. The Plaintiff's objection to the Motion to Dismiss shall be filed by September 4, 2019. The Defendant's reply to the Motion to Dismiss shall be filed by September 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/6/2019. (Bempong, Tracy)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Entry of Stipulated Order. See order attached. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/6/2019. (Bempong, Tracy)
August 6, 2019 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kari A. Dooley: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/6/2019. Total Time: 0 hours and 30 minutes. (Court Reporter Traci Walker) (Bempong, Tracy)
August 6, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference regarding the parties' proposed stipulated order [47-1] set for 8/6/2019 at 4:30 PM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Conference Line: (888) 278-0296; Access Code: 80-77-899. (Bempong, Tracy)
August 2, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Kroopa S. Desai on behalf of MEI Americas, LLC (Desai, Kroopa)
August 2, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Jane Larimer on behalf of MEI Americas, LLC (Larimer, Abigail)
August 2, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith W. Caiafa on behalf of MEI Americas, LLC (Caiafa, Meredith)
August 2, 2019 Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Order by Mott Corp.Responses due by 8/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMahon, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 46 Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bin Huang, MEI Americas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Bin Huang with Exhibit A)(Moffett, Rowena)
August 1, 2019 Filing 45 Memorandum in Support re #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Complaint) filed by Bin Huang, MEI Americas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Bin Huang)(Moffett, Rowena)
August 1, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Complaint) by Bin Huang, MEI Americas, LLC.Responses due by 8/22/2019 (Moffett, Rowena)
July 30, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 8/7/2019. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for September 16, 2019 at 9:30 am in Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Kari A. Dooley. (Bempong, Tracy)
July 30, 2019 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kari A. Dooley: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/30/2019. Total Time: 0 hours and 10 minutes(Court Reporter Traci Walker.) (Bempong, Tracy)
July 30, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 04:30 PM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Conference Line: (888) 278-0296; Access Code: 80-77-899. (Bempong, Tracy)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Abigail L. Larimer. Signed by Clerk on 7/24/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
July 23, 2019 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #37 MOTION for Attorney(s) Abigail L. Larimer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5370116) by Bin Huang, MEI Americas, LLC. (Moffett, Rowena)
July 23, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #34 MOTION for Attorney(s) Meredith W. Caiafa to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5368918) by Bin Huang, MEI Americas, LLC. (Moffett, Rowena)
July 23, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Attorney(s) Abigail L. Larimer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5370116) by Bin Huang, MEI Americas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Moffett, Rowena)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Meredith W. Caiafa; granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney(s) Kroopa S. Desai, Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/21/2019. Signed by Clerk on 7/22/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kroopa S. Desai to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5368922) by Bin Huang, MEI Americas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Moffett, Rowena)
July 22, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Attorney(s) Meredith W. Caiafa to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5368918) by Bin Huang, MEI Americas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Moffett, Rowena)
July 16, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .(Responses due by 8/1/2019, ), Answer deadline updated for Bin Huang to 8/1/2019; MEI Americas, LLC to 8/1/2019. (Gould, K.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Preliminary Injunction Hearing #5 set for 8/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Kari A. Dooley. (Bempong, Tracy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kari A. Dooley: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/16/2019. Total Time: 0 hours and 15 minutes (Bempong, Tracy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Conference Line: (888) 278-0296; Access Code: 80-77-899. (Bempong, Tracy)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Defendants shall file a responsive pleading to the complaint and respond to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction by August 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/16/2019. (Bempong, Tracy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 29 Memorandum in Opposition re #28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint and as to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction until August 1, 2019 filed by Mott Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McMahon, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint and as to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction until August 1, 2019 by Bin Huang, MEI Americas, LLC. (Moffett, Rowena)
July 12, 2019 Filing 27 Supplemental SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mott Corp. (Gunningsmith, Damian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MEI Americas, LLC. (Moffett, Rowena)
July 9, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Gemma Seidita on behalf of Mott Corp (Seidita, Gemma)
July 9, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gemma Seidita to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5334416) by Mott Corp. (Seidita, Gemma)
July 9, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael N Sheetz on behalf of Mott Corp (Sheetz, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #2 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael N. Sheetz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5334347) by Mott Corp. (Sheetz, Michael)
July 5, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mott Corp. Bin Huang served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019; MEI Americas, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Gunningsmith, Damian)
July 5, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mott Corp. Bin Huang served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019; MEI Americas, LLC served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Gunningsmith, Damian)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Rowena Amanda Moffett on behalf of Bin Huang (Moffett, Rowena)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Horvack, Jr on behalf of Mott Corp (Horvack, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kari A. Dooley: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/2/2019. Total Time: 2 minutes(Court Reporter: Traci Walker.) (Gould, K.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Rowena Amanda Moffett on behalf of MEI Americas, LLC (Moffett, Rowena)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael J. McMahon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5334399) by Mott Corp. (McMahon, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. McMahon on behalf of Mott Corp (McMahon, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael N. Sheetz ; granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. McMahon ; granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gemma Seidita Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/25/2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/26/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Bin Huang, MEI Americas, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Damian K. Gunningsmith* *Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP - NH* *195 Church St. 18th floor, PO Box 1950* *New Haven, CT 06509-1950*. (Fazekas, J.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Mott Corp, #2 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael N. Sheetz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5334347) filed by Mott Corp, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Notice of Related Case filed by Mott Corp, #3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael J. McMahon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5334399) filed by Mott Corp, #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gemma Seidita to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5334416) filed by Mott Corp, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mott Corp, #10 Standing Protective Order, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mott Corp Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/25/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/25/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/24/2019. Discovery due by 12/25/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 25, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Gunningsmith, Damian)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mott Corp. (Gunningsmith, Damian)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case by Mott Corp (Gunningsmith, Damian)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mott Corp.Responses due by 7/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit D. Allen, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gunningsmith, Damian)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gemma Seidita to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5334416) by Mott Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Seidita)(Gunningsmith, Damian)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael J. McMahon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5334399) by Mott Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit McMahon)(Gunningsmith, Damian)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael N. Sheetz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5334347) by Mott Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sheetz)(Gunningsmith, Damian)
June 25, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5334309.), filed by Mott Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit CIVIL COVER)(Gunningsmith, Damian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mott Corp v. MEI Americas, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bin Huang
Represented By: Rowena Amanda Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEI Americas, LLC
Represented By: Rowena Amanda Moffett
Represented By: Meredith W. Caiafa
Represented By: Kroopa S. Desai
Represented By: Abigail Jane Larimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mott Corp
Represented By: Damian K. Gunningsmith
Represented By: Adam Gershenson
Represented By: John R. Horvack, Jr.
Represented By: Michael N Sheetz
Represented By: Bryan Matthew Koch
Represented By: Michael J. McMahon
Represented By: Gemma Seidita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?