Van Hise v. Flooring Technologies Inc.
Plaintiff: DENISE VAN HISE
Defendant: FLOORING TECHNOLOGIES INC. d/b/a QFLOORS and Flooring Technologies Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00995
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Certify Class and for a Temporary Stay of Further Proceedings on that Motion. Responses due by 9/2/2019. (Imbriani, Susan)
August 12, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Flooring Technologies Inc. to 9/2/2019. (Imbriani, Susan)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #6 MOTION to Certify Class. Response due by 9/2/2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/12/2019. (Grossfeld, Eric)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time until 09/02/19 to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/12/2019. (Grossfeld, Eric)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Certify Class and for a Temporary Stay of Further Proceedings on that Motion until 09/02/19 by Flooring Technologies Inc.. (Denniston, Garrett)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/02/19 to respond to Complaint #1 Complaint by Flooring Technologies Inc.. (Denniston, Garrett)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett A. Denniston on behalf of Flooring Technologies Inc. (Denniston, Garrett)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa A. Bellair on behalf of Flooring Technologies Inc. (Bellair, Marisa)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Denise Van Hise. Flooring Technologies Inc. served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Kelly, Ryan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Flooring Technologies Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ryan Michael Kelly* *Anderson & Wanca* *3701 Algonquin Road, Suite 500* *Rolling Meadows, IL 60008*. (Fanelle, N.)
June 27, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Flooring Technologies Inc.. (Kelly, Ryan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Certify Class and for a Temporary Stay of Further Proceedings on that Motion by Denise Van Hise.Responses due by 7/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Kelly, Ryan)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Carpet & Tile By the Mile. Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/25/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/25/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/24/2019 Discovery due by 12/25/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2020 Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/25/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
June 25, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION against FLOORING TECHNOLOGIES INC. d/b/a QFLOORS ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5334598.), filed by DENISE VAN HISE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - copy of fax, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelly, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Hise v. Flooring Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOORING TECHNOLOGIES INC. d/b/a QFLOORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flooring Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Garrett A. Denniston
Represented By: Marisa A. Bellair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE VAN HISE
Represented By: Ryan Michael Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?