Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv00996
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until after the parties hold a conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and agree on a new pretrial schedule Extension of Pre-Trial Deadlines by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Third-Party Subpeona. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/12/2019. (Washington, Gregory)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case by Malibu Media, LLC (Conway, Kevin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference by Malibu Media, LLC.Responses due by 7/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Colette Pelissier, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint & Exhibits) (Fazekas, J.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Malibu Media, LLC, #1 Complaint filed by Malibu Media, LLC, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/25/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/25/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/24/2019. Discovery due by 12/25/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 25, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5334762.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conway, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Kevin T. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?