Nelson v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Moses Nelson
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and U.S. Bank NA
Case Number: 3:2019cv01001
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 50 Notice to counsel in transferred case. Signed by Clerk on 6/27/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/25/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/25/2019.(Oliver, T.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/24/2019 Discovery due by 12/25/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2020 Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2019.(Oliver, T.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 44 Case electronically transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:17-cv-04045. Modified on 6/26/2019 to correct date filed (Anastasio, F.).
June 18, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Connecticut (jwh)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting #33 Motion to Dismiss; denying #40 Motion to Strike: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's Motion [dkt. no. 40] is denied and Defendants' Motion [dkt. no. 33] is granted. Because venue is improper in this District, and because it is "in the interest of justice" to do so, this action is transferred to the District of Connecticut. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/18/2019) (jwh) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
November 15, 2018 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #40 MOTION to Strike Document No. #39 . . Document filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bizar, David)
November 6, 2018 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PURS. TO FRCP RULE 9(b) & 12(f) re: #40 MOTION to Strike Document No. #39 . Document filed by Moses Nelson. (sc)
November 6, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' REPLY MEMORANDUM PURS. TO FRCP RULE 9(b) & 12(f);re: to Strike Document No. #39 . Document filed by Moses Nelson.(sc)
October 17, 2018 Filing 39 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer. . Document filed by Bank of America Funding 2007-1 Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bizar, David)
October 10, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION(Response)IN OPPOSITION TO THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPRPOPER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER; re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer. Document filed by Moses Nelson. (sc)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Granting #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #33 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer. (Responses due by 10/10/2018). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/25/2018) (rjm)
September 19, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER; re: for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #33 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer. Document filed by Moses Nelson.(sc)
August 30, 2018 Filing 35 DECLARATION of William Lugo in Support re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer.. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bizar, David)
August 30, 2018 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer. . Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bizar, David)
August 30, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Bizar, David)
August 21, 2018 Filing 32 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Attorney Frank E. Morreale terminated.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/21/2018) (jwh)
August 16, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION for Frank Morreale to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A..(Morreale, Frank)
August 16, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 8/30/2018. (jwh)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/15/2018) (jwh)
August 14, 2018 Filing 29 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from David M. Bizar dated August 14, 2018. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Bizar, David)
August 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. answer due 8/30/2018; U.S. Bank, N.A. answer due 8/30/2018. (jwh)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/13/2018) (jwh)
August 10, 2018 Filing 27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Frank Morreale, Esq. dated August 10, 2018. Document filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A..(Morreale, Frank)
August 10, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank E. Morreale on behalf of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Morreale, Frank)
August 2, 2018 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank of America Funding 2007-1 Trust, Bank of America Funding Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Moses Nelson.(sc)
July 12, 2018 Mailed a copy of #24 Order Reopening Case,, Set Deadlines to Moses Nelson, 1584 North Avenue, Bridgeport, CT 06604. (rro)
July 12, 2018 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #24 Order Reopening Case to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (jwh)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall reopen the case, and Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint no later than August 2. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff. (Amended Pleadings due by 8/2/2018.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/12/2018) (jwh)
November 6, 2017 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re: #22 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #20 Memo Endorsement,. Defendants' Consent to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 7/20/17 Notice, #2 Exhibit B - 10/24/17 Notice)(Bizar, David)
October 23, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION PURS. TO FRCP RULE 60(b)(1); re: #20 Memo Endorsement. Document filed by Moses Nelson.(sc)
October 23, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PRO SE, by Moses Nelson. (sc)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #19 Letter, filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ENDORSEMENT: In light of Plaintiff's failure to prosecute this action diligently and his failure to follow this Court's orders, the action is dismissed. The Clerk of the Court shall mark this action closed and all pending motion denied as moot. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/2/2017) (jwh)
September 26, 2017 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from David M. Bizar dated 9/26/2017 Document filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Bizar, David)
July 20, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Frank E. Morreale on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A.. New Address: Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP, 50 N. Laura Street, Suite 4100, Jacksonville, FL, USA 32202, (904) 665-3651. (Morreale, Frank)
July 20, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/7/2017. (jwh)
July 20, 2017 Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #13 Motion to Amend/Correct. ENDORSEMENT: The motion is granted. The amended complaint shall be filed no later than August 7, 2017. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/17/2017) (jwh)
June 29, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Frank E. Morreale on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A.. New Address: Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP, 50 N. Laura Street, Suite 4100, Jacksonville, FL, USA 32202, 904-665-3651. (Morreale, Frank)
June 23, 2017 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from David M. Bizar dated June 23, 2017 re: Assent to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Bizar, David)
June 23, 2017 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Frank Morreale, Esq. dated June 23, 2017 re: Assent to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. Document filed by U.S. Bank, N.A..(Morreale, Frank)
June 21, 2017 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge J. Paul Oetken is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
June 20, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT PURS. TO FRCP RULE 15(a)(2). Document filed by Moses Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint)(sc)
June 15, 2017 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Transfer Case - Letter Motion to Transfer Case -. Document filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Bizar, David) Modified on 8/9/2017 (ldi).
June 7, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Michael Bizar on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bizar, David)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/5/2017) (mro)
June 1, 2017 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #5 Notice of Removal addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Frank Morreale, Esq. dated June 1, 2017. Document filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Morreale, Frank)
June 1, 2017 Filing 8 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Morreale, Frank)
June 1, 2017 Filing 7 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank, N.A.. Document filed by U.S. Bank, N.A..(Morreale, Frank)
May 31, 2017 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Morreale, Frank)
May 31, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 301014/2017..Document filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Morreale, Frank)
May 30, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Frank E. Morreale. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 100,000,000; County code Bronx. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 100,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
May 30, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 30, 2017 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (vf)
May 30, 2017 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (vf)
May 30, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Frank E. Morreale to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): PDF Error; pleading reflects incorrect divisional office of case number. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
May 30, 2017 Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #4 Notice of Removal. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number 0208-13720909, paid on 5/30/2017. (vf)
May 30, 2017 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 301014/2017..Document filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Bank of America Funding 2007-1 Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Morreale, Frank) Modified on 5/31/2017 (vf).
May 30, 2017 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Bank of America Funding 2007-1 Trust. Document filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Bank of America Funding 2007-1 Trust.(Morreale, Frank)
May 30, 2017 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Document filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Bank of America Funding 2007-1 Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Morreale, Frank)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Morreale, Frank) Modified on 5/31/2017 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: David M. Bizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank NA
Represented By: David M. Bizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moses Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?