Pinto et al v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: Cipriano Jorge Pinto and Joanne Pinto
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Alex M. Azar, II, Charles Rettig, Steven Terner Mnuchin, U.S. Internal Revenue Service, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Svc and U.S. Department of the Treasury
Case Number: 3:2019cv01015
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on six on August 1, 2019, filed by Cipriano Jorge Pinto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit receipts for certified mail)(Carter, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 First SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cipriano Jorge Pinto. Alex M. Azar, II served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Svc served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Steven Terner Mnuchin served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Charles Rettig served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; U.S. Department of the Treasury served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Carter, Robert)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 EXHIBIT by Cipriano Jorge Pinto re #1 Complaint. (Carter, Robert)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 EXHIBIT E by Cipriano Jorge Pinto re #1 Complaint. (Carter, Robert)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 EXHIBIT D by Cipriano Jorge Pinto re #1 Complaint. (Carter, Robert)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 EXHIBIT C by Cipriano Jorge Pinto re #1 Complaint. (Carter, Robert)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 EXHIBIT B by Cipriano Jorge Pinto re #1 Complaint. (Carter, Robert)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 EXHIBIT A by Cipriano Jorge Pinto re #1 Complaint. (Carter, Robert)
July 1, 2019 Docket Entry Correction re #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines -- was entered in error. (Velez, F.)
July 1, 2019 Docket Entry Correction re #9 Electronic Summons Issued, #7 Electronic Summons Issued: Re-issued summons to reflect 60 days for answer due. (Velez, F.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Alex M. Azar, II, Steven Terner Mnuchin, Charles Rettig* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Robert F. Carter* *Carter & Civitello* *Woodbridge Office Park, 1 Bradley Road, Ste. 305* *Woodbridge, CT 06525*. (Velez, F.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Svc, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of the Treasury, U.S. Internal Revenue Service* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Robert F. Carter* *Carter & Civitello* *Woodbridge Office Park, 1 Bradley Road, Ste. 305* *Woodbridge, CT 06525*. (Velez, F.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR: ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Alex M. Azar, II, Steven Terner Mnuchin, Charles Rettig* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert F. Carter* *Carter & Civitello* *Woodbridge Office Park, 1 Bradley Road, Ste. 305* *Woodbridge, CT 06525*. (Velez, F.) Modified on 7/1/2019 (Velez, F.).
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Cipriano Jorge Pinto. Signed by Clerk on 6/28/2019. (Velez, F.)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/27/2019. (Velez, F.)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/27/2019. (Velez, F.)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/27/2019. (Velez, F.)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR: Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/26/2019; Discovery due by 12/27/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/27/2019. (Velez, F.) Modified on 7/1/2019 to indicate entered in error (Velez, F.).
June 27, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 27, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Carter, Robert)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5337295.), filed by Cipriano Jorge Pinto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through F)(Carter, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinto et al v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Rettig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Terner Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Svc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cipriano Jorge Pinto
Represented By: Robert F. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Pinto
Represented By: Robert F. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?