Miller et al v. Great Northern Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Garold Miller and Katharine Miller
Defendant: Great Northern Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01024
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 8/27/19 Telephone Status Conference rescheduled to 8/30/2019 03:45 PM before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer (Pesta, J.)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/22/19. (Pesta, J.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time until the next date the Court is available for the Telephonic Conference on 8-27-19 by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Lettiero, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 04:30 PM before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. (Freberg, B)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McCormack, Michael)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/5/2019. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/12/2019. (Freberg, B)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss until 09/05/2019 by Garold Miller, Katharine Miller. (McCormack, Michael)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/22/2019. (Freberg, B)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS (Doc. #13). Defendant has filed a motion to dismiss that principally challenges the adequacy of factual pleadings in the complaint to support Counts 2 and 3. On or before August 22, 2019, plaintiffs shall either file a response to the motion to dismiss or file an amended complaint that pleads as many facts as possible, consistent with Fed. R. Civ. P. 11, to address the alleged defects discussed in defendant's memorandum of law. If plaintiffs choose to file an amended complaint, the Court intends to deny defendant's motion to dismiss without prejudice to defendant's filing of a renewed motion to dismiss with respect to the amended complaint if warranted. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/5/2019.(Freberg, B)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Great Northern Insurance Company.Responses due by 8/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Lettiero, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Great Northern Insurance Company to 8/1/2019. (Freberg, B)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time #11 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 1, 2019 to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/3/2019. (Freberg, B)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 1, 2019 to Respond to Complaint by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Lettiero, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/12/2019. (Gutierrez, Y.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. McCormack on behalf of Garold Miller, Katharine Miller (McCormack, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice (Other) filed by Great Northern Insurance Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Great Northern Insurance Company, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Great Northern Insurance Company, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Great Northern Insurance Company, #8 Protective Order, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Great Northern Insurance Company Signed by Clerk on 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Freberg, B)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/28/2019.(Freberg, B)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/28/2019.(Freberg, B)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/27/2019; Discovery due by 12/28/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2020. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/28/2019.(Freberg, B)
June 28, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Lettiero, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Great Northern Insurance Company Notice to Counsel Re Local Rule 5(b) (Lettiero, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Great Northern Insurance Company Defendant's Statement in Compliance with Standing Order for Removed Cases (Lettiero, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Great Northern Insurance Company Defendant's Notice of Pending Motions (Lettiero, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Great Northern Insurance Company from Connecticut Superior Court Judicial District of Hartford, case number HHD-CV19-6112865-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5339281, filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Lettiero, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Great Northern Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael F Lettiero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garold Miller
Represented By: Amy E. Markim
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katharine Miller
Represented By: Amy E. Markim
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?