Geiger et al v. Hamilton Street Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Lynn Geiger and Lina Posada
Defendant: Hamilton Street Enterprises, LLC and William Santiaga
Case Number: 3:2019cv01036
Filed: June 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie M. Coulombe on behalf of Hamilton Street Enterprises, LLC, William Santiaga (Coulombe, Carrie)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J. Szilagyi on behalf of Hamilton Street Enterprises, LLC, William Santiaga (Szilagyi, Frank)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brenda Lynn Geiger, Lina Posada. Hamilton Street Enterprises, LLC served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; William Santiaga served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Radshaw, John)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John V. Golaszewski on behalf of Brenda Lynn Geiger, Lina Posada (Golaszewski, John)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) John V. Golaszewski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5380703) by Brenda Lynn Geiger, Lina Posada. (Radshaw, John)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Attorney John V. Golaszewski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/30/2019. Signed by Clerk on 8/1/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) John V. Golaszewski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5380703) by Brenda Lynn Geiger, Lina Posada. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Atty. Golaszewski)(Radshaw, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 Report Form Completed on the Filing of an Action re: Trademark. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Agati, Kathryn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hamilton Street Enterprises, LLC, William Santiaga* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John J. Radshaw, III* *900 Chapel Street* *Suite 620* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Brenda Lynn Geiger, Lina Posada, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 7/1/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/29/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/29/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/28/2019, Discovery due by 12/29/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 2/2/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/29/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
June 29, 2019 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.)
June 29, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Radshaw, John)
June 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hamilton Street Enterprises, LLC, William Santiaga ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5340666.), filed by Brenda Lynn Geiger, Lina Posada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Radshaw, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geiger et al v. Hamilton Street Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Street Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Carrie M. Coulombe
Represented By: Frank J. Szilagyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Santiaga
Represented By: Carrie M. Coulombe
Represented By: Frank J. Szilagyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Lynn Geiger
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Posada
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?