Lavoie v. Fidelity Life Association et al
Plaintiff: Noreen Lavoie
Defendant: Fidelity Life Association and Concentrix Insurance Administration Solutions Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01046
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/14/2019 (Perez, J.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosemarie Paine on behalf of Noreen Lavoie (Paine, Rosemarie)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Concentrix Insurance Administration Solutions Corporation, Fidelity Life Association.(Valerio, Michael)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Concentrix Insurance Administration Solutions Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Concentrix Global Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent SYNNEX Corporation for Concentrix Insurance Administration Solutions Corporation. (Valerio, Michael)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fidelity Life Association identifying Corporate Parent Vericity Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Members Mutual Holding Company, Corporate Parent Vericity, Inc. for Fidelity Life Association. (Valerio, Michael)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Valerio on behalf of Concentrix Insurance Administration Solutions Corporation, Fidelity Life Association (Valerio, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Noreen Lavoie.(Keyes, John)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff is directed to file the Amended Complaint on the docket by 7/26/2019. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/22/2019. (Washington, Gregory)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Noreen Lavoie.Responses due by 8/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Keyes, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noreen Lavoie. Concentrix Insurance Administration Solutions Corporation served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019; Fidelity Life Association served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Keyes, John)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Concentrix Insurance Administration Solutions Corporation, Fidelity Life Association* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John A. Keyes* *350 Orange Street* *New Haven, CT 06511* (Fazekas, J.)
July 3, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Keyes, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Noreen Lavoie, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 7/2/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/2/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/2/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2019. Discovery due by 1/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/5/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/2/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 2, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5344391.), filed by Noreen Lavoie. (Attachments: #1 CIVIL COVER SHEET)(Keyes, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lavoie v. Fidelity Life Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noreen Lavoie
Represented By: John A. Keyes
Represented By: Rosemarie Paine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Life Association
Represented By: Michael A. Valerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concentrix Insurance Administration Solutions Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Valerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?