Arnold v. Praxair, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Larry A Arnold
Defendant: Praxair, Inc. and Praxair Pension Plan
Case Number: 3:2019cv01047
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM against Larry A Arnold by Praxair Pension Plan, Praxair, Inc..(Alexander, Lori)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori B. Alexander on behalf of Praxair Pension Plan, Praxair, Inc. (Alexander, Lori)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 Docket Entry Correction re 13 Order, modified to reflect entered in error in this case. (Lewis, D)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENTERED IN ERROR - ORDER: The Court notes the Order (Doc. No. 25 ) entered on 8/9/2019 by Judge Sarah A.L. Merriam. In light of the infinite postponement of a settlement conference, the defendants answer or response to the Complaint is now due by August 26, 2019. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/12/2019.(Lewis, D) Modified on 8/12/2019 (Lewis, D).
August 12, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Praxair Pension Plan to 9/2/2019; Praxair, Inc. to 9/2/2019. (Lewis, D)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation filed by Praxair Pension Plan, Praxair, Inc. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/12/2019.(Lewis, D)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Praxair Pension Plan, Praxair, Inc.. (Junk, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Praxair Pension Plan to 8/12/2019; Praxair, Inc. to 8/12/2019. (Lewis, D)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Larry A Arnold re #1 Complaint (Praxair, Inc.) (Rintoul, David)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Larry A Arnold re #1 Complaint (Rintoul, David)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Praxair Pension Plan, Praxair, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David Skinner Rintoul* *Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, LLC* *1000 Lafayette Boulevard, P.O. Box 1740* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Reis, Julia)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Praxair Pension Plan, Praxair, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David Skinner Rintoul* *Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, LLC* *1000 Lafayette Boulevard, P.O. Box 1740* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Reis, Julia)
July 17, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Larry A Arnold. (Rintoul, David)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Larry A Arnold, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 7/3/2019.(Reis, Julia)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/2/2019.(Reis, Julia)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/2/2019.(Reis, Julia)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/2/2019.(Reis, Julia)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2019 Discovery due by 1/1/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 2/5/2020 Signed by Clerk on 7/2/2019.(Reis, Julia)
July 2, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5344761.), filed by Larry A Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rintoul, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. Praxair, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry A Arnold
Represented By: David Skinner Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praxair, Inc.
Represented By: Lori B. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praxair Pension Plan
Represented By: Lori B. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?