Pelaccia v. Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Massimo Pelaccia
Defendant: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01072
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/23/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 10/9/2019 to hold the Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/3/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 3, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company to 10/16/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 10/16/2019 to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/3/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until October 9, 2019 to Hold Rule 26(F) Conference by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (McCoy, Heather)
September 3, 2019 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until October 16, 2019 To Respond to Complaint by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (McCoy, Heather)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Joseph Minnella on behalf of Massimo Pelaccia (Minnella, Martin)
August 5, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/23/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 9/9/2019 to Conduct the parties Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/5/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 5, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company to 9/16/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 9/16/2019 to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/5/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until September 9, 2019 to Hold Rule 26(F) Conference by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (McCoy, Heather)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until September 16, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (McCoy, Heather)
July 11, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company to 8/15/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 8/15/2019 to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/11/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 15, 2019 to Plead by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Schimelman, Benjamin)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Isaac Schimelman on behalf of Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company (Schimelman, Benjamin)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company NOTICE OF SERVICE (Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, #9 Standing Protective Order, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company Signed by Clerk on 07/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Murphy, Tatihana)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 07/09/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 07/09/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/7/2019. Discovery due by 1/8/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/12/2020. Signed by Clerk on 07/09/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
July 9, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather L McCoy on behalf of Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company (McCoy, Heather)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Harleysville Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Allied Holdings (Delaware), Inc., Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE WITH STANDING ORDER (Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS (Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth F. Ahlstrand on behalf of Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company (Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company from Superior Court of Connecticut, Judicial District of New Haven, case number NNH-CV19-6093805-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5351580, filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pelaccia v. Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth F. Ahlstrand
Represented By: Heather L McCoy
Represented By: Benjamin Isaac Schimelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massimo Pelaccia
Represented By: Joseph Tramuta, Jr.
Represented By: Martin Joseph Minnella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?