Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Hank's Dairy Bar, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Hank's Dairy Bar, Inc. and Steven DeVost, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01085
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Atain Specialty Insurance Company by Hank's Dairy Bar, Inc..(Gasser, Edward)
August 15, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Steven DeVost, Jr to 10/14/2019. (Smith, E)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/13/2019 to Plead. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 8/15/2019. (Smith, E)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/13/2019 to Plead by Steven DeVost, Jr. (Fitzpatrick, Kelly)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward W. Gasser on behalf of Hank's Dairy Bar, Inc. (Gasser, Edward)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Fitzpatrick on behalf of Steven DeVost, Jr (Fitzpatrick, Kelly)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Steven DeVost, Jr served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Berry, Stephanie)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Hank's Dairy Bar, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Berry, Stephanie)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hank's Dairy Bar, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thomas Tang* *Tang & Maravelis, P.C.* *50 Mall Road, Suite 111* *Burlington, MA 01803*. (Oliver, T.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Steven DeVost, Jr* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thomas Tang* *Tang & Maravelis, P.C.* *50 Mall Road, Suite 111* *Burlington, MA 01803*. (Oliver, T.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Sweeney Berry on behalf of Atain Specialty Insurance Company (Berry, Stephanie)
July 15, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Hank's Dairy Bar, Inc.. (Tang, Thomas)
July 15, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Steven DeVost, Jr. (Tang, Thomas)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/10/2019. Discovery due by 1/11/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 12, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Anastasio, F.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT to Civil Action Cover Sheet by Atain Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Complaint. (Tang, Thomas)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Tang, Thomas)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5357306.), filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Supplement)(Tang, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Hank's Dairy Bar, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hank's Dairy Bar, Inc.
Represented By: Edward W. Gasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven DeVost, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly A. Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Tang
Represented By: Stephanie Sweeney Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?