USA v. Bank of America Checking Account XXXXXXXX8836, Value $10,675.13 et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Bank of America Checking Account XXXXXXXX7880, Value $2,100.03, Bank of America Interest Bearing Account XXXX3Y80, Value $4,564.05, Bank of America Checking Account XXXXXXXX5626, Value $4,790.86, Bank of America Checking Account XXXXXXXX3818, Value $761.15, Bank of America Checking Account XXXXXXXX8836, Value $10,675.13 and Bank of America Checking Account XXXXXXXX3805, Value $3,000.00
Claimant: Long D. Nguyen
Case Number: 3:2019cv01091
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Long D. Nguyen.(Cramer, Richard)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 CLAIM Verified by Long D. Nguyen. (Cramer, Richard)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Cramer on behalf of Long D. Nguyen (Cramer, Richard)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/13/2019; Discovery due by 1/14/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 2/18/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/15/19.(Imbriani, Susan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by USA, #2 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 7/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 15, 2019 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Anastasio, F.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America Checking Account XXXXXXXX3805, Value $3,000.00, Bank of America Checking Account XXXXXXXX3818, Value $761.15, Bank of America Checking Account XXXXXXXX5626, Value $4,790.86, Bank of America Checking Account XXXXXXXX7880, Value $2,100.03, Bank of America Checking Account XXXXXXXX8836, Value $10,675.13, Bank of America Interest Bearing Account XXXX3Y80, Value $4,564.05, filed by USA.(Hughes, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Bank of America Checking Account XXXXXXXX8836, Value $10,675.13 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Checking Account XXXXXXXX7880, Value $2,100.03
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Interest Bearing Account XXXX3Y80, Value $4,564.05
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Checking Account XXXXXXXX5626, Value $4,790.86
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Checking Account XXXXXXXX3818, Value $761.15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Checking Account XXXXXXXX8836, Value $10,675.13
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Checking Account XXXXXXXX3805, Value $3,000.00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Long D. Nguyen
Represented By: Richard S. Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: John B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?