Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Adrien Johnson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv01095
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Referring Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
2 Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Adrien Johnson. (Payton, R.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason P. Peck on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Peck, Jason)
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adrien Johnson. (Payton, R.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 19 Letter from Adrien Johnson Re: forged checks. (Velez, F.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Adrien Johnson (Oliver, T.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Adrien Johnson. (Oliver, T.)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER VACATING DKT. 14. The order dismissing case was entered in error. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/22/2019. (Lindberg, Christina)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 VACATED: ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) with prejudice and without costs or fees to either party in light of the Plaintiff's 13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/22/2019. (Lindberg, Christina) Modified on 7/22/2019 (Shafer, J.).
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice. The affidavit is not signed. Plaintiff has 21 days to refile. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/22/2019. (Lindberg, Christina)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 ENTERED IN ERROR-NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Adrien Johnson, 7 Order of Transfer, #10 Standing Protective Order, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #11 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Adrien Johnson, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 07/19/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) Modified on 7/19/2019 (Murphy, Tatihana).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 07/19/19.(Murphy, Tatihana)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 07/19/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 07/19/19.(Murphy, Tatihana)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/17/2019. Discovery due by 1/18/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/22/2020. Signed by Clerk on 07/19/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Vanessa L. Bryant for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/19/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 16, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Commissioner of Social Security to 9/16/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/16/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/16/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adrien Johnson. Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Fazekas, J.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Adrien Johnson.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jason P. Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrien Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?