Pilgrim Interiors, Inc. et al v. Cutter Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pilgrim Interiors, Inc.
Defendant: Cutter Enterprises, LLC and Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv01118
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Cutter Enterprises, LLC to 9/30/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 9/30/2019 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff, Pilgrim Interiors, Inc.'s ("Pilgrim"), Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/18/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until September 30, 2019 to File a Responsive Pleading to #1 Complaint by Cutter Enterprises, LLC. (Martin, Peter)
September 18, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America to 9/30/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 9/30/2019 to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/18/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/30/2019 to File a Responsive Pleading to the Complaint by Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America. (Horowitz, Matthew)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Horowitz on behalf of Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America (Horowitz, Matthew)
August 21, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Cutter Enterprises, LLC to 9/19/2019; Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America to 9/19/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 9/19/2019 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff, Pilgrim Interiors, Inc.'s complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/21/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 19, 2019 to Respond to #1 Complaint by Cutter Enterprises, LLC, Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America. (Martin, Peter)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Martin on behalf of Cutter Enterprises, LLC, Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America (Martin, Peter)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Cutter Enterprises, LLC, Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Meaghan Murphy* *Bacon Wilson, P.C.* *33 State Street* *Springfield, MA 01103*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Pilgrim Interiors, Inc., #2 Exhibit filed by Pilgrim Interiors, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 07/22/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 07/22/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 07/22/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/20/2019. Discovery due by 1/21/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/25/2020. Signed by Clerk on 07/22/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
July 22, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT Civil Action Cover Sheet by Pilgrim Interiors, Inc.(USA for the use and benefit of) re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Murphy, Meaghan)
July 22, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Murphy, Meaghan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5367450.), filed by Pilgrim Interiors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Murphy, Meaghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pilgrim Interiors, Inc. et al v. Cutter Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutter Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Peter J. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America
Represented By: Peter J. Martin
Represented By: Matthew M. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pilgrim Interiors, Inc.
Represented By: Meaghan Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?