Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Johnson
Plaintiff: Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Ronald Johnson
Case Number: 3:2019cv01122
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Ronald Johnson served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (McCarthy, Liam)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ronald Johnson* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Liam J. McCarthy* *Crowley & McCarthy, PC* *220 Broadway, Suite 405* *Lynnfield, MA 01940*. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company, and #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 7/22/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 7/22/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/20/2019, Discovery due by 1/21/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 2/25/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/22/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
July 22, 2019 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.)
July 22, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Ronald Johnson. (McCarthy, Liam)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (McCarthy, Liam)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ronald Johnson ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5368299.), filed by Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(McCarthy, Liam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Liam J. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?