Zuru LLC v. Lego Systems Inc et al
Plaintiff: Zuru LLC
Defendant: LEGO Juris A/S, Lego Systems Inc and Lego A/S
Case Number: 3:2019cv01128
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Lomas on behalf of Zuru LLC (Lomas, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #73 MOTION for Attorney(s) John W. Lomas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5414942) by Zuru LLC. (Allentuch, Simon)
September 12, 2019 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #73 MOTION for Attorney(s) John W. Lomas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5414942) by Zuru LLC. (Allentuch, Simon)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #73 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John W. Lomas. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/27/2019. Signed by Clerk on 08/28/2019. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 27, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION for Attorney(s) John W. Lomas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5414942) by Zuru LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A--Affidavit of John W. Lomas)(Allentuch, Simon)
July 31, 2019 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #69 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tami Lyn Azorsky to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5379391) by Zuru LLC. (Azorsky, Tami)
July 31, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Tami Lyn Azorsky on behalf of Zuru LLC (Azorsky, Tami)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tami Lyn Azorsky. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/29/2019. Signed by Clerk on 07/31/2019. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 30, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tami Lyn Azorsky to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5379391) by Zuru LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Allentuch, Simon)
July 25, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Simon Irving Allentuch on behalf of Zuru LLC (Allentuch, Simon)
July 23, 2019 Filing 66 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 23, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE TO COUNSEL in Transferred Case Signed by Clerk on 07/23/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 22, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 07/22/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 22, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 07/22/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 07/22/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 07/22/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/20/2019 Discovery due by 1/21/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 2/25/2020 Signed by Clerk on 07/22/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 22, 2019 Filing 60 Case electronically transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-00131. Modified on 7/23/2019 TO CORRECT THE DATE FILED (Oliver, T.).
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Defendants Motion to Transfer (Dkt. #48 ). (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) Case transferred electronically. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Discovery regarding Stay ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendants Lego A-S, Lego Juris A-S. Motion set for hearing on 8/19/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie J. Raubeson in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Melanie J. Raubeson, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Melanie J. Raubeson, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Melanie J. Raubeson)(White, William)
July 19, 2019 Filing 57 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #48 set for Monday, July 22, 2019 off calendar and under submission. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 15, 2019 Filing 56 MINUTES OF HRG: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Telephone conference held re discovery issue. Court Recorder: CS 07/15/19. (sbou)
July 15, 2019 Filing 55 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Telephone Conference re discovery matter set for 7/16/19 at 10:00AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Call-in informattion has been emailed to counsel.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ib) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #53 Non-Resident Attorney Melanie J Raubeson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Lego A-S, Lego Juris A-S, Lego Systems Inc., designating William A White as local counsel. (jp)
July 9, 2019 Filing 53 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Melanie J. Raubeson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Lego A-S, Lego Juris A-S, Lego Systems Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24053100) filed by Defendants Lego A-S, Lego Juris A-S, Lego Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (White, William)
July 8, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (First Amended Complaint) #48 filed by Defendants Lego A-S, Lego Juris A-S. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William A. White, #2 Exhibit A-D to Declaration of William A. White)(White, William)
July 1, 2019 Filing 51 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (First Amended Complaint) #48 filed by Plaintiff Zuru LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16)(Duvall, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #49 Non-Resident Attorney Tami Lyn Azorsky APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Zuru LLC, designating Michael J Duvall as local counsel. (jp)
June 27, 2019 Filing 49 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tami Lyn Azorsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Zuru LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23993131) filed by Plaintiff Zuru LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Duvall, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (First Amended Complaint) filed by Defendants Lego A-S, Lego Juris A-S. Motion set for hearing on 7/22/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth A. Alquist, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16) (White, William)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer granting in part Defendant's Ex Parte Application of Lego Defendants for Further Extension of Time, (Dkt #45 ) (See Order for Specifics). (rfi)
June 10, 2019 Filing 46 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint #45 filed by Plaintiff Zuru LLC. (Duvall, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 45 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Lego A-S, Lego Juris A-S. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth A. Alquist, #2 Exhibit A to Alquist Declaration, #3 Declaration of William A. White, #4 Exhibit A to White Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to White Declaration, #6 Proposed Order) (Bell, Jeffrey)
May 28, 2019 Filing 44 JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiff Zuru LLC (Duvall, Michael)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth A. Alquist to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants LEGO Systems, Inc., LEGO A/S and LEGO Juris A/S, designating William A. White as local counsel #42 . (gk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 42 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth A. Alquist to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Lego A-S, Lego Juris A-S, Lego Systems Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23805085) filed by Defendants Lego A-S, Lego Juris A-S, Lego Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney) (Bell, Jeffrey)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION of Remaining Lego Defendants for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint #40 . The LEGO Group answer shall be 6/14/2019. (jp)
May 6, 2019 Filing 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 6/14/2019 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #39 filed by Defendants Lego A-S, Lego Juris A-S. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William A. White, #2 Exhibit A to William A. White Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to William A. White Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) (Bell, Jeffrey)
April 24, 2019 Filing 39 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Lego A-S, Lego Juris A-S amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Zuru LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32)(Duvall, Michael)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: The LEGO Group's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's initial complaint is May 30, 2019. #35 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 3, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Lego A-S, Lego Juris A-S, identifying ZURU LLC; ZURU, Inc.; LEGO Systems, Inc.; LEGO A/S; LEGO Juris A/S; KIRKBI A/S; KIRKBI Invest A/S. (Bell, Jeffrey)
April 3, 2019 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Lego A-S, Lego Juris A-S identifying KIRKBI A/S; KIRKBI Invest A/S as Corporate Parent. (Bell, Jeffrey)
April 3, 2019 Filing 35 Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Consolidated Deadline for all Defendants to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Defendants Lego A-S, Lego Juris A-S, Lego Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William A. White, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of William A. White, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of William A. White, #4 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application of All Parties) (Attorney Jeffrey B Bell added to party Lego A-S(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey B Bell added to party Lego Juris A-S(pty:dft)) (Bell, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Michael J Duvall of Dentons US LLP for Plaintiff Zuru LLC in place and stead of Thomas M Dunlap, Brian M Koide, Nicholas A Kurtz #32 . (jp)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Michael J Duvall of Dentons US LLP for Plaintiff Zuru LLC in place and stead of Lisa Tan and Russakow and Tan, LLP #31 . (jp)
March 15, 2019 Filing 32 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Thomas M. Dunlap, Brian M. Koide, Nicholas A. Kurtz, and Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig PLLC as counsel of record filed by Plaintiff Zuru LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurtz, Nicholas)
March 15, 2019 Filing 31 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Lisa Tan and Russakow & Tan, LLP as counsel of record filed by Plaintiff Zuru LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurtz, Nicholas)
March 15, 2019 Filing 30 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENTS: Document Nos. #27 and #28 filed on 3/15/2019 are stricken for the reasons set forth in the NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. Counsel to refile the documents properly. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
March 15, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST of Lisa Tan and Russakow and Tan, LLP to Withdraw as Attorney #27 , REQUEST of Thomas M. Dunlap, Brian Koide, Nicholas A. Kurtz, and Dunlap Bennett and Ludwig PLLC to Withdraw as Attorney #28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Substitute Attorney (G-01) - under Category - Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests. Other error(s) with document(s): Request does not require to set hearing date. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
March 15, 2019 Filing 28 ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOCUMENT NO. 30*** REQUEST of Thomas M. Dunlap, Brian Koide, Nicholas A. Kurtz, and Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig PLLC to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiff Zuru LLC. Request set for hearing on 4/15/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurtz, Nicholas) Modified on 3/15/2019 (vv).
March 15, 2019 Filing 27 ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOCUMENT NO. 30*** REQUEST of Lisa Tan and Russakow & Tan, LLP to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiff Zuru LLC. Request set for hearing on 4/15/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurtz, Nicholas) Modified on 3/15/2019 (vv).
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #25 Non-Resident Attorney R Tyler Goodwyn, IV APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Zuru LLC, designating Michael J Duvall as local counsel. (jp)
March 13, 2019 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney R. Tyler Goodwyn, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Zuru LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 3/12/2019, Receipt No. 26G1T56U) filed by Plaintiff Zuru LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Duvall, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney R. Tyler Goodwyn, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Zuru LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23359909) #22 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by March 21, 2019. (yl)
March 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney R. Tyler Goodwyn, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Zuru LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23359909) #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64) also please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
March 12, 2019 Filing 22 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT'S RESPONSE, DE 24} ] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney R. Tyler Goodwyn, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Zuru LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23359909) filed by Plaintiff Zuru LLC. (Duvall, Michael) Modified on 3/13/2019 (yl).
March 8, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael J Duvall on behalf of Plaintiff Zuru LLC (Attorney Michael J Duvall added to party Zuru LLC(pty:pla))(Duvall, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Lego Systems, Inc's Ex Parte Application for Further Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint #18 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: LEGO Systems, Inc.'s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's initial complaint is extended to 4/15/2019. (jp)
March 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 4/15/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 #18 filed by Plaintiff Zuru LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 18 First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 4/15/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Lego Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey B. Bell, #2 Exhibit A to Jeffrey B. Bell Declaration, #3 Declaration of William A. White, #4 Exhibit A to William A. White Declaration, #5 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Lego Systems, Inc.S Ex Parte Application for Further Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint) (Bell, Jeffrey)
February 5, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Lego Systems Inc, identifying ZURU LLC; ZURU, Inc.; LEGO Systems, Inc.; LEGO A/S; LEGO Juris A/S; KIRKBI A/S; KIRKBI Invest A/S. (Bell, Jeffrey)
February 5, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Lego Systems Inc identifying LEGO A/S; KIRKBI A/S as Corporate Parent. (Bell, Jeffrey)
February 5, 2019 Filing 15 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Lego Systems Inc answer now due 3/15/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Lego Systems Inc.(Attorney Jeffrey B Bell added to party Lego Systems Inc(pty:dft))(Bell, Jeffrey)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN ASPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #12 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: Thomas M. Dunlap to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Zuru LLC, designating Lisa Tan as local counsel. (lom)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT: Document No. #12 filed on January 10, 2019 is stricken for failure to comply with this Court's standing order and Local Rule 5-4.4.2 which require that proposed orders be submitted to chambers email. Additionally the proposed order attached to the document does not provide the address of the local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 10, 2019 Filing 12 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas M. Dunlap to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Zuru LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23025973) filed by Plaintiff Zuru LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Lisa Tan added to party Zuru LLC(pty:pla)) (Tan, Lisa)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Zuru LLC, identifying ZURU Inc., ZURU LLC. (Koide, Brian)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Thomas M Dunlap. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Lego A-S, Lego Juris A-S, Lego Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Defendant Lego A-S, #2 Summons for Defendant Lego Juris A-S) (et)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by ZURU LLC. (Koide, Brian)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff ZURU LLC. (Koide, Brian)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ZURU LLC. (Koide, Brian)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23001505 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ZURU LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17) (Attorney Brian M Koide added to party ZURU LLC(pty:pla))(Koide, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuru LLC v. Lego Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEGO Juris A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lego Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lego A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuru LLC
Represented By: Simon Irving Allentuch
Represented By: Tami Lyn Azorsky
Represented By: John W. Lomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?