Britt v. Saul
Plaintiff: Irene Deniece Britt
Defendant: Andrew Saul,Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv01142
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405dc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time until October 23, 2019 an addendum to the 9/19/19 motion for additional time to file the transcript, with additional information regarding the reasons additional time is necessary #10 First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 23, 2019 to file the administrative record #1 Complaint by Andrew Saul. Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Peterson, Oona)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 23, 2019 to file the administrative record. On September 19, 2019, the Commissioner filed a motion seeking an extension of time until October 23, 2019, to file the Administrative Record in this case. See Doc #10 . The Commissioner was served with the Complaint in this matter on July 24, 2019. See Doc. #1 . Under the Standing Scheduling Order that was duly entered in this case (see Doc. #4 ), the Commissioner is required to file the Administrative Record within 60 days of service, that is, on or before September 22, 2019. As counsel are aware, the 60-day deadline for filing of the record constitutes an extension of the otherwise applicable deadlines in civil cases. Any motion for extension of time must provide "good cause" for the extension, which "requires a particularized showing that the time limitation in question cannot reasonably be met despite the diligence of the party seeking the extension." D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(b)(1). The Court cannot determine, based on the motion as filed, whether the Commissioner has exercised diligence in attempting to meet this deadline. Accordingly, the Commissioner shall file a notice on the docket, forthwith, indicating the date on which counsel requested the preparation of the transcript. That information will allow the Court to determine whether any extension of the filing deadline is warranted. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 9/20/2019. (Katz, S.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 23, 2019 to file the administrative record #1 Complaint by Andrew Saul. Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Peterson, Oona)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REMINDER: Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 9/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Oona Marie Peterson on behalf of Andrew Saul (Peterson, Oona)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. On July 24, 2019, plaintiff's counsel filed a "Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Andrew Saul." Additionally, plaintiff's complaint includes a request that "[a] summons be issued to the Defendant directing [him] to appear before this Court[.]" Doc. #1 at 3. As this Court has previously advised plaintiff's counsel, the Standing Order on Social Security Appeals in this District states: "In lieu of service of process of the Complaint and related documents, the Clerk of the Court shall provide service via the Court's CM/ECF system to the Commissioner of Social Security by electronically serving it on the Social Security Administration's Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Connecticut. If this process is followed, the Defendant has agreed that it will constitute adequate service of process." Doc. #4 at 2; see also Rivera v. Commissioner of Social Security, No. 19CV944(KAD), Doc. #6. The Complaint in this matter has been electronically served as contemplated by the Standing Order, and, as reflected in the docket, a deadline of September 22, 2019, has been set for the filing of the Transcript. Counsel is advised to review the new Standing Order, and in future cases, counsel need not file a request for service or issuance of a summons in Social Security Appeals. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 7/25/19. (Dowie, C)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without prepayment of fees, costs or security therefor, along with an affidavit regarding her current financial circumstances. See Doc. #2 . In plaintiff's motion, she states that she has been unemployed since March 2010. See id. at 3. Plaintiff relies on government benefits for support, specifically cash benefits in the amount of $219 each month. See id.. This income does not cover plaintiff's expenses, and plaintiff has no assets. See id. at 4-5. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 7/25/19. (Dowie, C)
July 24, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Andrew Saul to 9/22/2019. (Oliver, T.)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/24/2019. (Oliver, T.)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/24/2019. (Oliver, T.)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order on Social Security Appeals. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent form) (Oliver, T.)
July 24, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill and Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam (Oliver, T.)
July 24, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Andrew Saul. (Pierre Pierre, Eddy) Modified on 7/25/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Irene Deniece Britt. (Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Irene Deniece Britt against Andrew Saul, filed by Irene Deniece Britt. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Pierre Pierre, Eddy) Modified on 7/25/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Britt v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul,Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Oona Marie Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Deniece Britt
Represented By: Eddy Pierre Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?