Copeland v. US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National et al
Plaintiff: Marcia Copeland
Defendant: Governor's Office, US Bank, NA, Surety Title Company, Gary Zeitz, Attorney General Office, Camden County Sheriff's Office, Nan Famular, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, Sell-All-Properties, Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz, Tax Office and Wells Fargo N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01156
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Sell-All-Properties to 10/12/2019. (Johnson, D.)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: The #30 motion for extension is GRANTED. Defendant Sell-All-Properties shall have until October 12, 2019 to file a response to plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/16/2019. (Ram, Megha)
September 13, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Default Judgment as to any Defendant without an August 28, 2019 Answer to this Complaint by Marcia Copeland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Peterson, M)
September 13, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Default Judgment as to any Defendant without an August 28, 2019 Answer to this Complaint by Marcia Copeland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
September 13, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Order by Marcia Copeland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
September 12, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 12, 2019 to Plead by Sell-All-Properties. (Gardner, Kristi)
September 12, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Marie Gardner on behalf of Sell-All-Properties (Gardner, Kristi)
September 12, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig A. Fontaine on behalf of Sell-All-Properties (Fontaine, Craig)
September 5, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Surety Title Company, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz.Responses due by 9/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Notice to Defendant, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Affidavit)(Greene, Gary)
September 3, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Camden County Sheriff's Office to 9/30/2019. (Johnson, D.)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The #25 motion for extension by Camden County Sheriff's Office is GRANTED. Camden County Sheriff's Office shall have until September 30, 2019 to file an answer or other response to the plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/3/2019. (Ram, Megha)
August 30, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 30, 2019 to File a Responsive Pleading #14 Amended Complaint, by Camden County Sheriff's Office. (Gerarde, Thomas)
August 30, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin Kontyko on behalf of Camden County Sheriff's Office (Kontyko, Kaitlin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Gerarde on behalf of Camden County Sheriff's Office (Gerarde, Thomas)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Returning Submission as Deficient: Complaint, Addendum to Original returned to Plaintiff Marcia Copeland Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/28/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE: The Court received a set of papers mailed directly to chambers by plaintiff. This is not proper. The plaintiff is advised that she cannot send documents directly to chambers or to the judge. The plaintiff may - and shall - bring any matter related to the case she wishes to the Court's attention by filing a pleading or motion on the docket. To do that, she should either file an appearance and request to participate in e-filing or she must send the document to the Clerk's Office to be docketed as a motion or a pleading. Accordingly, the Clerk shall return the papers to the plaintiff and shall not docket them. The Clerk shall also mail a copy of this order to plaintiff. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/28/2019. (Ram, Megha)
August 27, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Wells Fargo N.A. to 9/30/2019. (Johnson, D.)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The plaintiff mailed a set of papers to the Clerk's Office entitled "Amendmened Complaint and Request for Injunction." The Court notes that the Clerk's Office filed this document on the docket twice -- once as an #14 amended complaint and once as a #15 motion for preliminary injunction. The Court further notes that there is only one operative complaint. Now that the plaintiff has filed an #14 amended complaint, that document is the operative complaint. The plaintiff is advised that any allegations in the #1 original complaint that are not also in the #14 amended complaint will not be considered by the Court. Accordingly, the #12 motion to dismiss by Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Surety Title Company, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, Gary Zeitz, and Robin Zeitz is DENIED AS MOOT as it no longer refers to the operative complaint. However, these defendants may renew their motion to dismiss in light of the amended complaint and incorporate by reference any prior briefing. In addition, the #18 motion for extension by Wells Fargo N.A. is GRANTED. Wells Fargo N.A. shall have until September 30, 2019 to file an answer or other response to the plaintiff's amended complaintSigned by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/27/2019. (Ram, Megha)
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Surety Title Company, Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz re #11 Notice (Other) (Greene, Gary)
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 30, 2019 to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the #1 Complaint by Wells Fargo N.A.. (Bizar, David)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo N.A.. (Bizar, David)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Bizar on behalf of Wells Fargo N.A. (Bizar, David)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Defendants filed a #12 motion to dismiss and a #11 notice to self-represented litigant. Pursuant to Local Rule 12(a), the movant "shall attach to the notice [to self-represented litigant] copies of the full text of Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7." Defendants did not attach copies of these rules to the #11 notice to self-represented litigant. Defendants shall refile, by August 27, 2019, the notice to self-represented litigant along with copies of the full text of Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/26/2019. (Ram, Megha)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Surety Title Company, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz.Responses due by 9/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Unreported Case)(Greene, Gary)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Surety Title Company, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz of Filing Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(a) (Greene, Gary)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Joseph Greene on behalf of Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Surety Title Company, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz (Greene, Gary)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Marcia Copeland. Responses due by 9/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Attorney General Office, Camden County Sheriff's Office, Nan Famular, Governor's Office, Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Sell-All-Properties, Surety Title Company, Tax Office, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, US Bank, NA, Wells Fargo N.A., Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz, filed by Marcia Copeland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE: Amend Caption to Include the Following Additional Defendants by Marcia Copeland (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Attorney General Office, Camden County Sheriff's Office, Nan Famular, Governor's Office, Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Sell-All-Properties, Surety Title Company, Tax Office, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, US Bank, NA, Wells Fargo N.A., Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Marcia Copeland* *2 Apple Ridge Way* *East Brunswick, NJ 08816* (Fazekas, J.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Marcia Copeland, #5 Standing Protective Order, #2 Notice of Manual Filing filed by Marcia Copeland Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENTERED IN ERROR - STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/26/2019.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 7/29/2019 (Fazekas, J.).
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/26/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/26/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/24/2019. Discovery due by 1/25/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/29/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/26/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Manual Filing of CD of Court Hearing, Camden District Court by Marcia Copeland (Fazekas, J.)
July 26, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Fazekas, J.) Modified on 7/29/2019 to correct file date (Fazekas, J.).
July 26, 2019 Filing fee received from Jackson Anesthesia LLC: $400.00, receipt number CTXB00010418. (Fazekas, J.)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marcia Copeland.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copeland v. US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surety Title Company
Represented By: Gary Joseph Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Zeitz
Represented By: Gary Joseph Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Kaitlin Kontyko
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nan Famular
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National
Represented By: Gary Joseph Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sell-All-Properties
Represented By: Craig A. Fontaine
Represented By: Kristi Marie Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Firm of Gary Zeitz
Represented By: Gary Joseph Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Zeitz
Represented By: Gary Joseph Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tax Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo N.A.
Represented By: David M. Bizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?