Bank of New York v. Consiglio et al
Plaintiff: Bank of New York
Defendant: Andrew Consiglio and Heather Lindsay
Case Number: 3:2019cv01161
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Case remanded to State Court Judicial District of Stamford. (Fanelle, N.)
August 2, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Gould, K.)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Bank of New York.Responses due by 8/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of motion for remand, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit B - Decision from first removal)(Knickerbocker, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Knickerbocker on behalf of Bank of New York (Knickerbocker, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 See Order of Remand attached. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/1/2019. (Bempong, Tracy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, Filing Fee Received, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Heather Lindsay, Andrew Consiglio Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/29/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/29/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2019. Discovery due by 1/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/3/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 29, 2019 Filing fee received from Heather Lindsay: $400.00, receipt number CTXB00010419. (Fazekas, J.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Heather Lindsay, Andrew Consiglio from Superior Court, Stamford, case number FST-CV-08-5006978-S., filed by Heather Lindsay, Andrew Consiglio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of New York v. Consiglio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York
Represented By: Fumio Erik Kaneko
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Knickerbocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?